Patriots Bank v. Krantz
Plaintiff: Patriots Bank
Defendant: Brad Krantz
Case Number: 2:2022cv04080
Filed: May 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2022 Filing 30 AMENDED DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty.(Pappas, Michael)
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING TELECONFERENCE. A teleconference is set for 7/25/2022 at 11:00am before Judge Nanette K. Laughrey to discuss Defendant's #28 Motion to Strike Scheduling Order. To participate, the parties shall call 877-336-1828 and enter access code 8503666. Signed on 7/18/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Gassen, Austin)
July 10, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION to strike #26 Scheduling Order, RELATED TO CERTAIN TRIAL DATES filed by Christopher M. Rohrer on behalf of Brad Krantz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/25/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Rohrer, Christopher)
June 30, 2022 Filing 27 RULES OF TRIAL. Signed on 06/30/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Discovery due by 1/17/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2023 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 4A, Jefferson City (NKL) before District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2023. Signed on 06/30/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Attachments: #1 Memo on PTC) (Lock, Tania)
June 30, 2022 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Christopher M. Rohrer on behalf of Defendant Brad Krantz.(Rohrer, Christopher)
June 29, 2022 Filing 24 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brad Krantz. (Rohrer, Christopher)
June 29, 2022 Filing 23 Amended PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Patriots Bank. (Pappas, Michael)
June 29, 2022 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
June 28, 2022 Filing 22 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Pappas, Michael)
June 27, 2022 Filing 21 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Jay Daugherty(Pappas, Michael)
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's #18 Motion to Withdraw Document is DENIED as moot. On or before June 29, 2022, Plaintiff shall re-file its proposed scheduling order without a signature line for the presiding judge, in compliance with applicable local rules and administrative procedures. Defendant shall file its own proposed scheduling order on or before the same date. The Defendant is further warned that future noncompliance with Court ordered deadlines may result in sanctions, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 16.1(e) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). Signed on 6/27/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Gassen, Austin)
June 27, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the documents filed on 06/23/2022 as Document Nos. 17 & 19. Document No. 17, Status Report, was actually a duplicate of Doc. 19, Proposed Scheduling Order. Both documents (17 & 19) have been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Lock, Tania)
June 23, 2022 Filing 19 This document has been deleted. PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Patriots Bank. (Pappas, Michael) Modified on 6/27/2022 (Lock, Tania).
June 23, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to withdraw document 17 Status Report filed by Michael Philip Pappas on behalf of Patriots Bank. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/7/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 17 ) (Pappas, Michael)
June 23, 2022 Filing 17 This document has been deleted. STATUS REPORT Concerning Proposed Scheduling Order by Patriots Bank. (Pappas, Michael) Modified on 6/27/2022 (Lock, Tania).
June 14, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Patriots Bank CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF PATRIOTS BANKS INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Philip Pappas on behalf of Plaintiff Patriots Bank.(Pappas, Michael)
June 6, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand on behalf of Brad Krantz.(Rohrer, Christopher)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey.Proposed scheduling order due by 6/15/2022. Rule 26 conference due by 6/8/2022. Signed on 05/25/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Signed on 05/25/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Lock, Tania)
May 25, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
May 25, 2022 Filing 11 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:22-cv-00318.
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT: By stipulation of the parties through their respective counsel, the Court takes up Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue. [Doc #7 ] Counsel stipulates that this matter be transferred to the Western District of Missouri. Relief requested to dismiss the case is denied. Defendant granted twenty (20) days to file responsive pleadings.The Clerk of the Court shall transfer this matter to the Western District of Missouri under 14 U.S.C. 1404(a) for further proceedings. So Ordered. ( Case to be transferred after 5/25/2022.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 05/11/2022. (ANP) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Brad Krantz. (Rohrer, Christopher) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
April 12, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Philip Pappas for Plaintiff Patriots Bank. (Pappas, Michael) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Brad Krantz. (Rohrer, Christopher) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Patriots Bank. Parent companies: Garnett Bancshares, Inc, Subsidiaries: n/a, Publicly held company: n/a,. (Pappas, Michael) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
April 7, 2022 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher Michael Rohrer for Defendant Brad Krantz. (Rohrer, Christopher) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
March 29, 2022 Filing 4 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Plaintiff Patriots Bank. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible # (moed-0001.pdf). Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 4/8/2022. (ANP) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
March 28, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Patriots Bank. Brad Krantz served on 3/19/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (Zluticky, Nicholas) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
March 18, 2022 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Jean C. Hamilton. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Attorney Nicholas J. Zluticky. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). (JKL) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Patriots Bank Process Server: D and B Legal Services (Zluticky, Nicholas) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]
March 17, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Brad Krantz with receipt number AMOEDC-9189711, in the amount of $402 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Patriots Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Civil Cover Sheet, #17 Original Filing Form, #18 Summons)(Zluticky, Nicholas) [Transferred from moed on 5/25/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patriots Bank v. Krantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patriots Bank
Represented By: Nicholas J. Zluticky
Represented By: Michael Philip Pappas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Krantz
Represented By: Christopher M. Rohrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?