Ramey v. Parson et al
Plaintiff: Corionsa Ramey
Defendant: Michael L. Parson, Eric Schmitt and Anne L. Precythe
Case Number: 2:2022cv04171
Filed: November 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2023 Filing 22 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Diefenbach, Tracy)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED the instant action is DISMISSED as moot. Signed on 1/17/23 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDERED Plaintiff's motion for an emergency TRO and preliminary injunction (Doc. #3) is DENIED. Signed on 11/25/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes.(Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 23, 2022 Filing 19 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Corene Kendrick on behalf of Plaintiff Corionsa Ramey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Scout Katovich)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Kendrick, Corene)
November 23, 2022 NOTICE OF HEARING CANCELLATION - The Oral Argument set for 11/25/2022 10:00 AM This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 22, 2022 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Andrew J Crane on behalf of Defendants Michael L. Parson, Anne L. Precythe, Eric Schmitt. Reply suggestions due by 12/6/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Crane, Andrew)
November 22, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of appearance by Andrew J Crane on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Andrew J Crane added to party Michael L. Parson(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew J Crane added to party Anne L. Precythe(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew J Crane added to party Eric Schmitt(pty:dft))(Crane, Andrew)
November 21, 2022 Filing 16 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 11/21/2022.Court takes up scheduling of the pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant to file suggestions in opposition by 5:00 p.m. on 11/22/22. Plaintiff to file reply suggestions by noon on 11/23/22. Counsel to email proposed order to Tracy_Diefenbach@mow.uscourts.gov at the time their respective briefing is filed. Oral Argument set for 11/25/2022 10:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Counsel appearing for Plaintiff(s): Anthony Rothert, Corene Kendrick, David Fathi and Scott Katovich. Counsel appearing for Defendant(s): Andrew Crane. Time in court: 2:30 pm to 2:45 pm. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657, denise_halasey@mow.uscourts.gov. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Conference call information previously provided to counsel.
November 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 11/21/2022 02:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Conference call information emailed to counsel.
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Scout Katovich for Corionsa Ramey allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable Brian C. Wimes. Please note new case number: 2:22-cv-04171-BCW. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #2 & #4 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Corene T. Kendrick and David C. Fathi for Corionsa Ramey allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. The Clerk's Office is respectfully directed to reassign this case. Signed on 11/21/2022 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Gassen, Austin)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re #8 Suggestions in Support of Motion, corrected affidavit of Tracy Ulstad by Corionsa Ramey. (Related document(s) #8 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 Motion to allow Scout Katovich to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8200961) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Corionsa Ramey. (Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #3 MOTION for temporary restraining order MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Plaintiff Corionsa Ramey. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Ramey affidavit, #2 Affidavit Ulstad affidavit)(Related document(s) #3 ) (Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to United States Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
November 21, 2022 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. This case is randomly reassigned to the Honorable District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 2:22-cv-04171-NKL. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 This document has been deleted. MOTION for leave to appear Scout Katovich filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Corionsa Ramey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/5/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 Motion to allow David C. Fathi to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8200752) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Corionsa Ramey. (Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order , MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Corionsa Ramey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/5/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Filing 2 Motion to allow Corene T. Kendrick to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8200645) filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Corene T. Kendrick. (Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Parson, Anne L. Precythe, Eric Schmitt filed by Anthony E. Rothert on behalf of Corene T. Kendrick. Filing fee $402, receipt number BMOWDC-8200617. Service due by 2/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rothert, Anthony)
November 21, 2022 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael L. Parson, Anne L. Precythe and Eric Schmitt. Directed to plaintiff for service. (Berner, Crystal)
November 21, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 11/21/2022 as Document No. 5, Motion for leave to appear. The document has been deleted as it was incorrectly filed. Counsel was contacted to refile document accordingly. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramey v. Parson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corionsa Ramey
Represented By: Anthony E. Rothert
Represented By: Gillian R. Wilcox
Represented By: Corene Kendrick
Represented By: David C Fathi
Represented By: Scout Katovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Parson
Represented By: Andrew J Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Schmitt
Represented By: Andrew J Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne L. Precythe
Represented By: Andrew J Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?