AOB Products Company v. Vista Outdoor Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AOB Products Company
Defendant: Vista Outdoor Inc. and Vista Outdoor Operations LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv04108
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Willie J Epps
Referring Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 0101 Patents
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2023 Filing 18 The Court hereby acknowledges receipt of Doc. No. #16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Signed on 7/25/23 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
July 24, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE to motion re #13 MOTION to dismiss case for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Transfer filed by David Robert Barnard on behalf of Plaintiff AOB Products Company. Reply suggestions due by 8/7/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Barnard, David)
July 24, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by AOB Products Company (Barnard, David)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/5/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2023 09:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 7/12/23 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
July 10, 2023 Filing 14 SUGGESTIONS in support re #13 MOTION to dismiss case for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Transfer filed by Luke Meriwether on behalf of Defendants Vista Outdoor Inc., Vista Outdoor Operations LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Bruno)(Related document(s) #13 ) (Meriwether, Luke)
July 10, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss case for Improper Venue or, in the Alternative, Transfer filed by Luke Meriwether on behalf of Vista Outdoor Inc., Vista Outdoor Operations LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/24/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Meriwether, Luke)
June 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Adrianna M. Chavez for AOB Products Company allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
June 27, 2023 Filing 11 Motion to allow Adrianna M. Chavez to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-8514561) filed by David Robert Barnard on behalf of AOB Products Company. (Barnard, David)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED Defendants' extension of time (Doc. #9 ) is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED Defendants shall respond to the complaint on or before July 10, 2023. Signed on 6/23/2023 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Ellis, Lindsey)
June 22, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) filed by Luke Meriwether on behalf of Vista Outdoor Inc., Vista Outdoor Operations LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/6/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Luke Meriwether added to party Vista Outdoor Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Luke Meriwether added to party Vista Outdoor Operations LLC(pty:dft))(Meriwether, Luke)
June 8, 2023 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by AOB Products Company. Vista Outdoor Operations LLC served on 6/5/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Barnard, David)
June 8, 2023 Filing 7 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by AOB Products Company. Vista Outdoor Inc. served on 6/5/2023, answer due 6/26/2023. (Barnard, David)
June 5, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. to District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This case number shall now read: 2:23-cv-04108-BCW. (Berner, Crystal)
May 31, 2023 Filing 5 ***Remark - AO-120, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Warren, Melissa)
May 31, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Warren, Melissa)
May 31, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vista Outdoor Inc. and Vista Outdoor Operations LLC.; emailed to plaintiffs counsel for service. (Berner, Crystal)
May 31, 2023 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 6/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Warren, Melissa)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Service must be obtained on all defendants within forty (40) days of the date of this Order unless otherwise authorized by the Court. Signed on 5/30/2023 by Magistrate Judge Willie J. Epps, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Minkler, Kaitlin)
May 30, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by David Robert Barnard on behalf of Plaintiff AOB Products Company.(Barnard, David)
May 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David Robert Barnard on behalf of AOB Products Company. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-8478124. Service due by 8/28/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnard, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AOB Products Company v. Vista Outdoor Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AOB Products Company
Represented By: David Robert Barnard
Represented By: Adrianna M. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Outdoor Inc.
Represented By: Luke Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vista Outdoor Operations LLC
Represented By: Luke Meriwether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?