Clark v. Taylor et al
Plaintiff: Terry J. Clark
Defendant: Debra Anne Taylor, Richard Andrews, Allan Paul Atha, George Andrew Marriott, Robert Harken and Robert Titus
Case Number: 2:2023cv04139
Filed: July 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2023 Filing 12 Before the Court is pro se Plaintiff Terry Clark's (Plaintiff) Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Doc. #11.) For reasons stated within, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #11) is DENIED. Signed on 9/7/2023 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Murphy-Carr, Shauna) (Clerk's note: A copy of order sent via first class mail to: Terry J. Clark, Box 405, Sunrise Beach, MO 65079. )
September 7, 2023 Filing 11 PRO SE MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by Terry J. Clark. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/21/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Copy of NEF mailed to Terry J. Clark at Box 405, Sunrise Beach, MO 65079.(Lock, Tania)
September 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Robert Ray Titus on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney Robert Ray Titus added to party Richard Andrews(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ray Titus added to party Robert Harken(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ray Titus added to party Debra Anne Taylor(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Ray Titus added to party Robert Titus(pty:dft))(Titus, Robert) Modified on 9/6/2023 (Warren, Melissa).
September 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of appearance by Robert G. Harken on behalf of All Defendants (Harken, Robert)
September 5, 2023 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Robert G. Harken on behalf of Defendants Richard Andrews, Allan Paul Atha, Robert Harken, George Andrew Marriott, Debra Anne Taylor, Robert Titus. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Harken, Robert)
September 5, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Robert G. Harken on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/19/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Robert G. Harken added to party Richard Andrews(pty:dft), Attorney Robert G. Harken added to party Robert Harken(pty:dft), Attorney Robert G. Harken added to party Debra Anne Taylor(pty:dft), Attorney Robert G. Harken added to party Robert Titus(pty:dft))(Harken, Robert)
August 24, 2023 Filing 6 PRO SE NOTICE of filing as civil cover sheet filed by Terry J. Clark. NEF mailed to Terry J. Clark at Box 405, Sunrise Beach, MO 65079. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Berner, Crystal)
August 24, 2023 Filing 5 PRO SE RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Terry J. Clark. Waiver sent to Richard Andrews on 8/3/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. NEF mailed to Terry J. Clark at Box 405, Sunrise Beach, MO 65079. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Berner, Crystal)
August 24, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Terry J. Clark. Waiver sent to Debra Anne Taylor on 8/3/2023, answer due 10/2/2023. NEF mailed to Terry J. Clark at Box 405, Sunrise Beach, MO 65079. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Berner, Crystal)
August 24, 2023 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE of filing of plaintiffs documents titled document 67 and 68 filed by Terry J. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 68)(Berner, Crystal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/24/2023: #2 Envelope) (Berner, Crystal). Modified on 8/24/2023 to reflect NEF mailed to Terry J. Clark at Box 405, Sunrise Beach, MO 65079. (Berner, Crystal)
August 14, 2023 Filing 2 PRO SE AMENDED COMPLAINT against Richard Andrews, Allan Paul Atha, Robert Harken, George Andrew Marriott, Debra Anne Taylor, Robert Titus and Terry J. Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 62, #2 Exhibit 63, #3 Exhibit 64, #4 Exhibit 65, #5 Exhibit 66, #6 Exhibit 92). NEF provided to plaintiff at JC front counter.(Warren, Melissa)
August 14, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Harken and Robert Titus. Summons provided to plaintiff for service. NEF provided to plaintiff at JC front counter. (Warren, Melissa)
July 19, 2023 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Debra Anne Taylor, Richard Andrews, Allan Paul Atha, George Andrew Marriott. Service due by 10/17/2023 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Berner, Crystal) Modified on 7/19/2023 to reflect NEF provided to plaintiff at JC counter. (Berner, Crystal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2023: #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5-8, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 13-16, #10 Exhibit 19, #11 Exhibit 26, #12 Exhibit 29, #13 Exhibit 31, #14 Exhibit 33, #15 Exhibit 35, #16 Exhibit 37, #17 Exhibit 39, #18 Exhibit 41, #19 Exhibit 47, #20 Exhibit 49, #21 Exhibit 53, #22 Exhibit 55, #23 Exhibit 57, #24 Exhibit 59, #25 Exhibit 61, #26 Exhibit 135, #27 Exhibit 145) (Berner, Crystal). Clerk's Note added on 7/19/2023: Exhibits 9, 12, 17-18, 20-25, 27-28, 30, 32, 34, 36, 38, 40, 42-46, 48, 50-52, 54, 56, 58, 60, 62-134, 136-144 were intentionally not submitted by the Plaintiff and should be considered "blank." (Berner, Crystal)
July 19, 2023 RECEIPT number KCMO101012 in the amount of $402 issued to Terry J. Clark at JC counter. (Berner, Crystal) Modified on 7/21/2023 to add receipt number. (Kern, Kendra)
July 19, 2023 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Andrews, Allan Paul Atha, George Andrew Marriott, Debra Anne Taylor. Provided to plaintiff at JC counter. (Berner, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Taylor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry J. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Anne Taylor
Represented By: Robert G. Harken
Represented By: Robert Ray Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Andrews
Represented By: Robert G. Harken
Represented By: Robert Ray Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Paul Atha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Andrew Marriott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Harken
Represented By: Robert G. Harken
Represented By: Robert Ray Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Titus
Represented By: Robert G. Harken
Represented By: Robert Ray Titus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?