Spencer v. Barton County Ambulance District et al
Plaintiff: Robert E. Spencer
Defendant: Barton County Ambulance District, Leisa Blanchard, Paul Stebbins, Cheryl Wood, Joe Francis and Craig Lehman
Counter_claimant: Barton County Ambulance District
Counter_defendant: Robert E. Spencer
Case Number: 3:2016cv05083
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Joplin Office
County: Barton
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 15:1938
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting 62 motion for summary judgment in favor of Defendant on Counts III and IV. Signed on 4/25/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Perry, Madison)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 55 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaims. Signed on 3/2/2017 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Perry, Madison)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 47 motion for leave to file amended answer and counterclaims; denying as moot 19 motion to dismiss counterclaim; and denying as moot 40 motion to strike affirmative defenses. Defendant Barton County Ambulance District shall have three business days to electronically file its Amended Answer and Counterclaims. Signed on 1/5/17 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. (Perry, Madison)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Barton County Ambulance District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E. Spencer
Represented By: Daniel K. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barton County Ambulance District
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leisa Blanchard
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Stebbins
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Wood
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Francis
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Lehman
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Barton County Ambulance District
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Matthew D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Robert E. Spencer
Represented By: Daniel K. Wooten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?