United States et al v. Blue Tee Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Peoria Tribe of Indians of Oklahoma, Cherokee Nation, Oklahoma, state of, Montana, state, United States, Missouri, Seneca-Cayuga Nation, Eastern Shawnee Tribe of Oklahoma, Illinois, Tennessee Attorney General, Colorado, State of, Wyandotte Nation, Ottawa Tribe of Oklahoma, Kansas, State of, Miami Tribe of Oklahoma and Tennessee
Defendant: Richard A. Secrist, William M. Kelly, Blue Tee Corp., David P. Alldian and Brown Strauss, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv05097
Filed: October 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:9601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge David P. Rush to District Judge Stephen R. Bough. New case number is: 3:18-cv-05097-SRB. (Text entry only; no document attached.) (Keller, Jeanne)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #3 , #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Andrew B Armstrong for Illinois, David Banas for Colorado, State of, Kate Gleeson for Kansas, State of, Katherine M. Hausrath for Montana, state, Jonathan Morgan for Montana, state, Jennifer L Lewis for Oklahoma, state of,Wilson Buntin for Tennessee, Brian J. Cleary for Cherokee Nation, Eastern Shawnee Tribe of Oklahoma,Miami Tribe of Oklahoma, Ottawa Tribe of Oklahoma, Peoria Tribe of Indians of Oklahoma, Seneca-Cayuga Nation, Wyandotte Nation allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of appearance by Kathleen M Whitby on behalf of Blue Tee Corp. (Whitby, Kathleen)
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 Motion to allow Brian Cleary to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6022360) filed by Fred L. Slough on behalf of Wyandotte Nation. (Attorney Fred L. Slough added to party Wyandotte Nation(pty:pla))(Slough, Fred)
November 5, 2018 Filing 13 Motion to allow Wilson Buntin to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6022279) filed by Mary A. Long on behalf of Tennessee. (Attorney Mary A. Long added to party Tennessee(pty:pla))(Long, Mary)
November 5, 2018 Filing 12 Motion to allow Jennifer L. Lewis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6022180) filed by Mary A. Long on behalf of Oklahoma, state of. (Attorney Mary A. Long added to party Oklahoma, state of(pty:pla))(Long, Mary) (Main Document 12 replaced on 11/13/2018) (Geiser, Angel).
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to allow Jonathan Morgan to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6022066) filed by Mary A. Long on behalf of Montana, state. (Long, Mary)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 Motion to allow Katherine Hausrath to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6021979) filed by Mary A. Long on behalf of Montana, state. (Attorney Mary A. Long added to party Montana, state(pty:pla))(Long, Mary)
November 5, 2018 Filing 9 Motion to allow Kate Gleeson to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6021958) filed by Mary A. Long on behalf of Kansas, State of. (Attorney Mary A. Long added to party Kansas, State of(pty:pla))(Long, Mary)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 Motion to allow David Banas to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6021915) filed by Mary A. Long on behalf of Colorado, State of. (Attorney Mary A. Long added to party Colorado, State of(pty:pla))(Long, Mary)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Kathleen M Whitby for Blue Tee Corp. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
November 2, 2018 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/23/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. Emailed to all plaintiff's counsel and to defendant, Blue Tee Corp. (Furtak, Rebecca)
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to allow Kathleen M. Whitby to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6017500) filed by Gerald P. Greiman on behalf of Blue Tee Corp.. (Greiman, Gerald)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Gerald P. Greiman on behalf of Blue Tee Corp. (Attorney Gerald P. Greiman added to party Blue Tee Corp.(pty:dft))(Greiman, Gerald)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Motion to allow Andrew B. Armstrong to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6016428) filed by Mary A. Long on behalf of Illinois. (Attorney Mary A. Long added to party Illinois(pty:pla))(Long, Mary) Modified on 11/5/2018 (Russel, Jeri).
October 31, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Lodging of Consent Decree by United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Consent Decree)(Dain, David)
October 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by David L. Dain on behalf of United States. Filing fee waived. Service due by 1/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dain, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States et al v. Blue Tee Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peoria Tribe of Indians of Oklahoma
Represented By: Brian James Cleary
Represented By: Fred L. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cherokee Nation
Represented By: Brian James Cleary
Represented By: Fred L. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oklahoma, state of
Represented By: Jennifer L Lewis
Represented By: Mary A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montana, state
Represented By: Katherine M. Hausrath
Represented By: Mary A. Long
Represented By: Jonathan M Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: David L. Dain
Represented By: Charles M. Thomas
Represented By: Katherine L Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri
Represented By: Mary A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seneca-Cayuga Nation
Represented By: Brian James Cleary
Represented By: Fred L. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eastern Shawnee Tribe of Oklahoma
Represented By: Brian James Cleary
Represented By: Fred L. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Illinois
Represented By: Andrew B Armstrong
Represented By: Mary A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado, State of
Represented By: Mary A. Long
Represented By: David Edward Banas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wyandotte Nation
Represented By: Brian James Cleary
Represented By: Fred L. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ottawa Tribe of Oklahoma
Represented By: Brian James Cleary
Represented By: Fred L. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Kate Gleeson
Represented By: Mary A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miami Tribe of Oklahoma
Represented By: Brian James Cleary
Represented By: Fred L. Slough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tennessee
Represented By: Wilson Buntin
Represented By: Mary A. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Secrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Tee Corp.
Represented By: Kathleen M Whitby
Represented By: Gerald P. Greiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David P. Alldian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown Strauss, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?