Garate et al v. Dunn et al
Plaintiff: Amy Grate, Carlos Garate and Amy Garate
Defendant: Gideon M Dunn and Silver Dollar City, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv03301
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Billam, Ashley)
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael J Lach on behalf of Defendant Gideon M Dunn.(Lach, Michael)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 10/16/2019 as Document No. 16, Defendant's Initial Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel has been contacted and will refile the correct document of Certificate of Service of Initial Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures, under Discovery Documents. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
October 16, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of filing Defendant's Initial Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosures by Gideon M Dunn (Lach, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Silver Dollar City, LLC of Defendant Silver Dollar City's Objections To Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories, Objections To Plaintiffs' First Request For Production Of Documents and Objections And Responses To Plaintiffs' First Request For Admissions filed by Patricia A. Keck on behalf of Defendant Silver Dollar City, LLC.(Keck, Patricia)
October 11, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Silver Dollar City, LLC of Defendant Silver Dollar City's First Interrogatories To Plaintiff Carlos Garate, First Interrogatories to Plaintiff Amy Garate and First Request For Production Of Documents to Plaintiffs filed by Patricia A. Keck on behalf of Defendant Silver Dollar City, LLC.(Keck, Patricia)
October 11, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Ashley Billam on behalf of Plaintiffs Amy Garate, Carlos Garate.(Billam, Ashley)
October 10, 2019 Filing 12 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 10/10/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2021 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for five days beginning 3/1/2021 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 9/30/2020., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2021 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 5/15/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2020., Discovery Motions due by 7/17/2020., Status Reports due by 12/9/2019; 2/7/2020; 4/7/2020; 6/8/2020 and 8/5/2020.) Discovery due by 8/14/2020. Signed on 10/10/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amy Garate, Carlos Garate Garate's 1st RFAS, RFP and ROGS to Dunn and SDC filed by Ashley Billam on behalf of Plaintiffs Amy Garate, Carlos Garate.(Billam, Ashley)
October 10, 2019 Filing 9 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Amy Garate, Carlos Garate. (Billam, Ashley)
October 10, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Patricia A. Keck on behalf of Defendant Silver Dollar City, LLC.(Keck, Patricia)
October 1, 2019 Filing 7 DEFENDANT GIDEON M. DUNN'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Gideon M Dunn.(Lach, Michael)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Michael J Lach on behalf of Gideon M Dunn (Attorney Michael J Lach added to party Gideon M Dunn(pty:dft))(Lach, Michael)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/25/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 10/10/2019. Signed on 9/10/19 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
September 6, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Carlos Garate, Amy Grate. Gideon M Dunn served on 8/31/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Johnson, Lynn)
August 27, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Silver Dollar City, LLC.(Attorney Patricia A. Keck added to party Silver Dollar City, LLC(pty:dft))(Keck, Patricia)
August 23, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gideon M Dunn, Silver Dollar City, LLC, and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS..Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6456636. Service due by 11/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Morantz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garate et al v. Dunn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Grate
Represented By: Ashley Billam
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: David R. Morantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Garate
Represented By: Ashley Billam
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: David R. Morantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Garate
Represented By: Ashley Billam
Represented By: Lynn R. Johnson
Represented By: David R. Morantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gideon M Dunn
Represented By: Michael J Lach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silver Dollar City, LLC
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?