Fitzsimmons v. Freeman Health System et al
Plaintiff: Dolores Fitzsimmons
Defendant: Freeman Health System, Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine and Todd Twiss, M.D.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05009
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by David E. Overby on behalf of Defendants Freeman Health System, Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine, Todd Twiss, M.D..(Overby, David)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/25/2020. Teleconference set for 7/31/2020 10:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 8/14/2020 1:30 PM via teleconference. Jury Trial set for 8/24/2020 8:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 4/18/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
April 17, 2019 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Overby, David)
April 17, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Joint Proposed Scheduling Order adn Discovery Plan by Freeman Health System, Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine, Todd Twiss, M.D.. (Overby, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to order re 13 Order to Show Cause, filed by Ronald P. Pope on behalf of Plaintiff Dolores Fitzsimmons. (Related document(s) 13 ) (Pope, Ronald)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Defendants' Motion to Strike should not be granted. Plaintiff's Show Cause Response due by 4/8/2019. Signed on 4/2/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
March 20, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 15, 2019 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by David E. Overby on behalf of Defendants Freeman Health System, Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine.(Overby, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION to strike filed by David E. Overby on behalf of Defendants Freeman Health System, Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine, Todd Twiss, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Registration of Fictitious Name, #2 Exhibit 2017-2018 Biennial Registration Report)(Related document(s) #10 ) (Overby, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to strike filed by David E. Overby on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Overby, David)
March 15, 2019 Filing 9 Defendants Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine and Todd Twiss, M.D.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Freeman Health System, Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine, Todd Twiss, M.D..(Overby, David)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/29/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/15/2019. Signed on 3/14/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by David E. Overby on behalf of All Defendants (Attorney David E. Overby added to party Freeman Health System(pty:dft), Attorney David E. Overby added to party Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine(pty:dft), Attorney David E. Overby added to party Todd Twiss, M.D.(pty:dft))(Overby, David)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Dolores Fitzsimmons. Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Pope, Ronald)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Dolores Fitzsimmons. Todd Twiss, M.D. served on 2/25/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. (Pope, Ronald)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Dolores Fitzsimmons. Freeman Health System served on 2/26/2019, answer due 3/19/2019. (Pope, Ronald)
February 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
February 20, 2019 SUMMONSES (3) ISSUED and emailed to plaintiff's counsel as to Freeman Health System, Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine, Todd Twiss, M.D.. (Siegert, Karen)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Dolores Fitzsimmons. (Pope, Ronald)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ronald P. Pope on behalf of Dolores Fitzsimmons. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6179839. Service due by 5/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pope, Ronald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fitzsimmons v. Freeman Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dolores Fitzsimmons
Represented By: Ronald P. Pope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Health System
Represented By: David E. Overby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeman Health System d/b/a Freeman Health System Orthopaedics and Sports Medicine
Represented By: David E. Overby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Twiss, M.D.
Represented By: David E. Overby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?