Ellis et al v. Army Corps of Engineers
Plaintiff: Stacey Lea Boyce, Craig Ellis and Donna Helgerson
Defendant: Army Corps of Engineers
Case Number: 3:2019cv05044
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: John T Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cynthia J. Hyde on behalf of Army Corps of Engineers. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/30/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Hyde, Cynthia)
August 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of appearance by Cynthia J. Hyde on behalf of Army Corps of Engineers (Attorney Cynthia J. Hyde added to party Army Corps of Engineers(pty:dft))(Hyde, Cynthia)
July 29, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for plaintiffs. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 8/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Stacey Lea Boyce, Craig Ellis, Donna Helgerson. Army Corps of Engineers served on 6/24/2019. (Millington, Thomas)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Stacey Lea Boyce, Craig Ellis, Donna Helgerson. U.S. Attorney General served on 6/25/2019. (Millington, Thomas)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Stacey Lea Boyce, Craig Ellis, Donna Helgerson. Army Corps of Engineers, Little Rock District served on 6/24/2019. (Millington, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Craig Ellis, Donna Helgerson, Stacey Lea Boyce. Army Corps of Engineers served on 6/20/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (Millington, Thomas)
June 18, 2019 SUMMONSES (4) ISSUED as to Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and emailed to plaintiff's counsel. (Siegert, Karen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen)
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for the plaintiffs. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 7/9/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Siegert, Karen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Army Corps of Engineers filed by Thomas W. Millington on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6362895. Service due by 9/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Millington, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis et al v. Army Corps of Engineers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Lea Boyce
Represented By: Thomas W. Millington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Ellis
Represented By: Thomas W. Millington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Helgerson
Represented By: Thomas W. Millington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Army Corps of Engineers
Represented By: Cynthia J. Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?