Hagen v. Jasper County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Sven Thor Hagen
Defendant: Jasper County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv05047
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT as directed by 7/18/19 order (Doc. #6 ) filed by Sven Thor Hagen.(Davies, Cindy)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for extension of time (Doc. #7 ). Plaintiff's amended complaint is now due on or before 8/14/2019. Additionally, the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of complaint forms. Signed on 07/31/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this Text Order along with a set of complaint forms sent to Plaintiff as directed.) (Willis, Kathy)
July 29, 2019 Filing 7 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for extension of time to filed amended complaint filed by Sven Thor Hagen. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/12/2019. (Davies, Cindy)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and is advised that the full $350 fee will be deducted in automatic increments from his inmate account if he proceeds with this case; (2) Plaintiff is ordered to file an amended complaint as set forth herein if he seeks to proceed with the case on or before August 1, 2019, or his case will be dismissed without further notice; and (3) the Clerk of the Court is directed to send Plaintiff another set of civil rights forms for his use in filing an amended complaint. Signed on July 18, 2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (CLERK'S NOTE: Civil rights forms mailed to plaintiff with copy of order as directed.) (Davies, Cindy)
July 10, 2019 RECEIPT number KCMO078621 in the amount of $5.70 issued to Sven Thor Hagen. (Ellis, Lindsey)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis; (2) Plaintiff shall pay to the clerk of the court for the Western District of Missouri, Western Division, an initial partial filing fee of $5.70; and (3) Plaintiff's failure to pay the required initial partial filing fee on or before July 10, 2019, will result in the dismissal of this case without further notice. Signed on June 26, 2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Davies, Cindy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Sven Thor Hagen. (Davies, Cindy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Sven Thor Hagen. (Davies, Cindy)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jasper County Detention Center filed by Sven Thor Hagen. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagen v. Jasper County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sven Thor Hagen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasper County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?