Foster v. Lawrence County Sheriffs Department et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Don Foster
Defendant: Lawrence County Sheriffs Department and Brad DeLay
Case Number: 3:2019cv05050
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Referring Judge: Prisoner Pro Se
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable; "return to sender - no longer a resident." Mail sent to Timothy Don Foster. (Related documents #7 and #8 ) (Davies, Cindy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT: This case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's order. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Court's previous order. (Willis, Kathy)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that this is case is DISMISSED, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with this Court's order. Any motion to reopen must be filed within a reasonable time and must comply with the Courts previous order. Signed on 08/12/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Willis, Kathy)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 Inmate ACCOUNT STATEMENT filed by Timothy Don Foster. (CLERK'S NOTE: Statement reflects plaintiff left the jail on 6/25/19. Plaintiff is also not listed in the online inmate roster.) (Davies, Cindy)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) granting Plaintiff provisional leave to proceed in forma pauperis, and (2) requiring Plaintiff to update or confirm his address on or before 8/6/2019, or this case will be dismissed without further notice. Signed on 07/23/2019 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Casey, Susan).
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 MAIL RETURNED as undeliverable, marked "return to sender-refused-unable to forward", sent to Timothy Don Foster. (Related document(s) 3 ) (Willis, Kathy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 2 IFP FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed by Timothy Don Foster. (Davies, Cindy)
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Timothy Don Foster. (Davies, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Lawrence County Sheriffs Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence County Sheriffs Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad DeLay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Don Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?