Blackbird Tech, LLC v. DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC
Plaintiff: Blackbird Tech, LLC
Defendant: Damar Worldwide 4 LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv05066
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 60 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Megan E McCullough on behalf of Defendant Damar Worldwide 4 LLC.(McCullough, Megan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE of appearance by Megan E McCullough on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC (Attorney Megan E McCullough added to party Damar Worldwide 4 LLC(pty:dft))(McCullough, Megan)
October 30, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/3/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2019 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/28/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #56 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michael O. Kassak for Damar Worldwide 4 LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
October 23, 2019 Filing 56 Motion to allow Michael O. Kassak to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6549910) filed by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC. (Roper, Joseph)
October 18, 2019 Filing 55 Before the Court is Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel. (Doc. #54). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Attorney Marc Casarino is removed as counsel of record for Defendant Damar Worldwide 4, LLC. Signed on 10/18/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to withdraw as attorney (Marc Casarino) filed by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Roper, Joseph)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying #51 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. The court has denied your pro hac vice motion because, counsel wishing to seek admission must affirm good standing membership in any and all District Courts in which they are a member. If you still wish to proceed pro hac vice in this case, please refile your motion providing all information required under Rule 83.5(h). To avoid being charged a duplicate fee, please insert the receipt number issued for this motion in the receipt box on your new filing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Wendy H. Verlander for Blackbird Tech, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
October 14, 2019 Filing 51 Motion to allow Jeffrey D. Ahdoot to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6536879) filed by Scott R. Brown on behalf of Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
October 14, 2019 Filing 50 Motion to allow Wendy Verlander to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6536868) filed by Scott R. Brown on behalf of Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Brown, Scott)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Frank A Bruno for Damar Worldwide 4 LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
October 10, 2019 Filing 48 Motion to allow Frank A. Bruno to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6534160) filed by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC. (Roper, Joseph)
October 10, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE of appearance by Joseph J. Roper on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4 LLC (Attorney Joseph J. Roper added to party Damar Worldwide 4 LLC(pty:dft))(Roper, Joseph)
October 2, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of appearance by Scott R. Brown on behalf of Blackbird Tech, LLC (Attorney Scott R. Brown added to party Blackbird Tech, LLC(pty:pla))(Brown, Scott)
September 19, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
September 19, 2019 Filing 44 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:16-cv-00969.
September 16, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Delaware has been opened in Western District of Missouri as case 3:19-cv-05006, filed 09/16/2019. (nmg) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 43 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,086,747 B2. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order)(nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Case transferred to the United States District Court for Western District of Missouri. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TRANSFER ORDER: The captioned case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/29/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Oral Argument held on 8/28/2019 re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southwestern Division. Local counsel present for plaintiff: S. Stamoulis. Local counsel present for defendant: M. Casarino, F. Bruno. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) (crb) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Disclosure of Terms Proposed for Construction filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORAL ORDER: A hearing on the Motion to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southwestern Division (D.I. #33 ) is now set for 8/28/2019, at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 6A. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 8/8/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
July 25, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southwestern Division filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Casarino, Marc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
July 15, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southwestern Division filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 7/22/2019. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
June 28, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Clifford Chad Henson, by Blackbird Tech, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 7/1/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Preliminary Infringement Contentions filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer Venue and to Submit Preliminary Invalidity Contentions (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southwestern Division. Answering Brief due 7/15/2019, Reply Brief due 7/25/2019). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 6/12/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Briefing Schedule for Motion to Transfer Venue and to Submit Preliminary Invalidity Contentions to July 15, 2019, July 25, 2019, and August 9, 2019 - filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 OPENING BRIEF in Support re #33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southwestern Division filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 6/14/2019. (Casarino, Marc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
May 31, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri, Southwestern Division - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Casarino, Marc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (32 in 16-cv-969-RGA, 31 in 16-cv-973-RGA) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for preliminary disclosures to June 12, 2019 and July 10, 2019. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/30/2019. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00969-RGA, 1:16-cv-00973-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 32 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for preliminary disclosures to June 12, 2019 and July 10, 2019 - filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
May 16, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial production of core technical documents and revenue information on behalf of Damar Worldwide 4, LLC filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC.(Casarino, Marc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SO ORDERED Granting #29 Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/1/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
April 30, 2019 Filing 29 PROPOSED Protective Order, by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Casarino, Marc) Modified on 5/1/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
April 30, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The filing at D.I. 29 has been removed from the docket as the incorrect filing event code was used. Counsel shall refile the proposed order using the proposed order event code, not the motion code. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
April 5, 2019 CORRECTING ENTRY: The notice filed at D.I. 29 has been removed from the docket as it was duplicative of the notice filed at D.I. #28 . (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
April 4, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Preliminary Identification of Accused Products & Asserted Claims and File History filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
March 15, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC.(Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Disclosures filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC.(Casarino, Marc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
March 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED to Chief Magistrate Judge Mary Pat Thynge for Mediation. Please see Standing Order dated January 20, 2016, regarding disclosure of confidential ADR communications. A link to the standing order is provided here for your convenience at # http://www.ded.uscourts.gov/general-orders/magistrate-judges-standing-order-adr-mediation Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00969-RGA, 1:16-cv-00970-RGA, 1:16-cv-00973-RGA(cak) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 7/24/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 7/24/2019. Fact Discovery completed by 4/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 11/25/2020. Joint Claim Construction Brief due by 12/4/2019. A Markman Hearing is set for 1/7/2020, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A Pretrial Conference is set for 3/26/2021, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 6A. A 5 day Jury Trial is set to start 4/5/2021, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/6/2019. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00969-RGA, 1:16-cv-00970-RGA, 1:16-cv-00973-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
March 6, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard G. Andrews - Scheduling Conference held on 3/6/2019. Local counsel present for Plaintiff: S. Stamoulis. Local counsel present for Defendants: M. Casarino, K. Grivner, M. McGovern. (Court Reporter Heather Triozzi.) Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00969-RGA, 1:16-cv-00970-RGA, 1:16-cv-00973-RGA(crb) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED Scheduling Order, Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 3/4/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC: Entry of appearance of attorney Marc Stephen Casarino. Attorney Blake A. Bennett, Richard M. Carter, and Adam J. Eckstein terminated. (Casarino, Marc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael O. Kassak, filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Michael O. Kassak - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Casarino, Marc) Modified on 2/15/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Bruno, filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/15/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Bruno - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Proposed Order)(Casarino, Marc) Modified on 2/15/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Stephen Casarino on behalf of DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC (Casarino, Marc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Clifford Chad Henson for Blackbird Tech, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00973-RGA, 1:16-cv-00969-RGA, 1:16-cv-00970-RGA(ceg) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Jeffrey D. Ahdoot for Blackbird Tech, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 3/6/2019, at 3:00 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORAL ORDER: The request to lift the stay and reopen the case (D.I. #17 ) is GRANTED. A Rule 16(b) Conference will be set for 3/6/2019, at 3:00 PM (*paper order to follow). Ordered by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/6/2019. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 5, 2019 Filing 17 STATUS Letter Requesting Rule 16 Conference, by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 2/5/2019 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (18 in 16-cv-973-RGA, 20 in 16-cv-970-RGA, 16 in 16-cv-969-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clifford Chad Henson and Jeffrey Ahdoot, filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00969-RGA, 1:16-cv-00970-RGA, 1:16-cv-00973-RGA(nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
January 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Clifford Chad Henson and Jeffrey Ahdoot - filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
October 11, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Blackbird Tech, LLC (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
March 9, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of of Withdrawal of Counsel by Blackbird Tech LLC, Blackbird Tech, LLC (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SO ORDERED Granting #12 STIPULATION of Stay Pending Appeal. Case is administratively closed. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2017. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
February 24, 2017 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Stay Pending Appeal - filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stamoulis, Stamatios) Modified on 2/24/2017 (nms). [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
January 11, 2017 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Caleb Holdings, Inc. for DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
December 19, 2016 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC.(Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 28, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Wendy H. Verlander,Christopher R. Freeman,Sean K. Thompson for Blackbird Tech, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re (7 in 16-cv-972-RGA, 8 in 16-cv-965-RGA, 7 in 16-cv-966-RGA, 12 in 16-cv-970-RGA, 5 in 16-cv-1044-RGA, 7 in 16-cv-967-RGA, 6 in 16-cv-973-RGA, 7 in 16-cv-971-RGA, 7 in 16-cv-968-RGA, 9 in 16-cv-969-RGA) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendy Verlander, Christopher Freeman, and Sean Thompson, filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/17/2016. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00965-RGA et al.(nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 17, 2016 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Wendy Verlander, Christopher Freeman, and Sean Thompson - filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 12/19/2016, filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC (Reset Answer Deadlines: DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC answer due 12/19/2016). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/9/2016. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Answer Complaint to 12/19/2016 - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 9, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Blake A. Bennett on behalf of DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Adam J. Eckstein for DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (klc) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Eckstein, filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/2/2016. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Adam J. Eckstein - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 2, 2016 Pro Hac Vice Attorney Richard M. Carter for DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lmm) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED, re #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Carter, filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/1/2016. (nms) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
November 1, 2016 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Richard M. Carter - filed by DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC. (Bennett, Blake) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
October 26, 2016 Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:16-cv-00965-RGA through 1:16-cv-00973-RGA (rjb) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
October 20, 2016 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC on 10/20/2016. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
October 19, 2016 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
October 19, 2016 Filing 3 Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 7,086,747 B2. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
October 19, 2016 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]
October 19, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2016252.) - filed by Blackbird Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(cna) [Transferred from ded on 9/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackbird Tech, LLC v. DAMAR Worldwide 4 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damar Worldwide 4 LLC
Represented By: Marc Stephen Casarino
Represented By: Richard M. Carter
Represented By: Blake A. Bennett
Represented By: Adam J. Eckstein
Represented By: Frank A Bruno
Represented By: Joseph J. Roper
Represented By: Michael O. Kassak
Represented By: Megan E McCullough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blackbird Tech, LLC
Represented By: Stamatios Stamoulis
Represented By: Wendy H. Verlander
Represented By: Christopher R. Freeman
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Ahdoot
Represented By: Clifford Chad Henson
Represented By: Sean K. Thompson
Represented By: Richard Charles Weinblatt
Represented By: Scott R. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?