Hutson v. Barry County, Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Hutson
Defendant: Leonard Collins, Barry County, Missouri and Gary Davis
Case Number: 3:2019cv05072
Filed: September 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES by Plaintiff filed by Michael Kemp Horn on behalf of Plaintiff Christopher Hutson.(Horn, Michael)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/11/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2021 at 3:00 PM MJ Courtroom, Springfield (DPR) before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. Jury Trial set for 3/15/2021 at 9:00 AM in MJ Courtroom, Springfield (DPR) before Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2020. (Berziel, Karla)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Amended PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER (Joint) by Christopher Hutson. (Horn, Michael)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Christopher Hutson. (Horn, Michael) (Main Document 6 replaced to correct signatures, on 11/14/2019. NEF regenerated.) (Keller, Jeanne).
November 13, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Ron Mitchell(Horn, Michael)
November 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. In accordance with Local Rules 16.1 and 26.1, the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order on or before 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush on 11/5/2019. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Barry County, Missouri, Leonard Collins, Gary Davis, Christopher Hutson. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 27, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
September 27, 2019 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to counsel for plaintiff and defendant. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 10/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca) Modified on 9/27/2019 (Furtak, Rebecca).
September 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Barry County, Missouri County, case number 19BR-CC00075, All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6511728. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Remington)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutson v. Barry County, Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Hutson
Represented By: Michael Kemp Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard Collins
Represented By: Remington Barrett Smith
Represented By: Matthew Justin Gist
Represented By: Christopher M Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry County, Missouri
Represented By: Remington Barrett Smith
Represented By: Matthew Justin Gist
Represented By: Christopher M Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Davis
Represented By: Remington Barrett Smith
Represented By: Matthew Justin Gist
Represented By: Christopher M Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?