Parker et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kendra Parker and Bless Parker
Defendant: Robert Thomas, Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6415 and Sam's East, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv05091
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Defendant Sams East, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Object, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents is GRANTED, up to and including January 17, 2020. Signed on 1/3/20 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Jarrow, James)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time to complete discovery (TO ANSWER, OBJECT, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS) filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Sam's East, Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/17/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Jarrow, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Jarrow, James)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES and Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production filed by Kurt J. Larson on behalf of Plaintiffs Bless Parker, Kendra Parker.(Larson, Kurt)
December 18, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 7/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/10/2020. Teleconference set for 12/28/2020 11:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 10:00 AM via teleconference. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Springfield (VJC) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 12/13/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER and Discovery Plan by Bless Parker, Kendra Parker. (Larson, Kurt)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Kevin Fitzgerald(Larson, Kurt)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's East, Inc. filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc..(Jarrow, James)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs filed by Kurt J. Larson on behalf of Plaintiffs Bless Parker, Kendra Parker.(Attorney Kurt J. Larson added to party Bless Parker(pty:pla))(Larson, Kurt)
November 13, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/23/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 12/9/2019. Signed on 11/8/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Furtak, Rebecca)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6415.(Jarrow, James)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by James R. Jarrow on behalf of Defendant Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6415.(Jarrow, James)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from In The Circuit Court of Jasper County, Missouri County, case number 19AO-CC00249, Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6415. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6574205. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Jarrow, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendra Parker
Represented By: Kurt J. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bless Parker
Represented By: Brad E Miller
Represented By: Kurt J. Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club #6415
Represented By: James R. Jarrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Jarrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?