Oasis of Joplin v. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Oasis of Joplin
Defendant: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv05052
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: M Douglas Harpool
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company filed by Curtis O. Roggow on behalf of Defendant Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Roggow, Curtis)
August 5, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Curtis O. Roggow on behalf of Defendant Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Roggow, Curtis)
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES 7/31/2020 filed by Scott G Hunziker on behalf of Plaintiff Oasis of Joplin.(Hunziker, Scott)
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Kent Hyde(Roggow, Curtis)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 RULES OF TRIAL Signed on 7/27/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND JURY TRIAL ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2021 01:00 PM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Jury Trial set for four days beginning 9/13/2021 09:00 AM in DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool., Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2021., Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2021 08:30 AM DJ Courtroom 1, Springfield (MDH) before District Judge M. Douglas Harpool.), ( Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2020., Discovery Motions due by 2/1/2021., Status Reports due by 10/27/2020 and 1/27/2021.) Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Signed on 7/27/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Roggow, Curtis)
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Oasis of Joplin. (Hunziker, Scott)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS 7/20/2020 filed by Scott G Hunziker on behalf of Plaintiff Oasis of Joplin.(Hunziker, Scott)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Roggow, Curtis)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Petition. Defendant Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company has up to and including 7/10/2020 to answer or otherwise respond. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Roubal, Kristen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by Curtis O. Roggow on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/16/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Roggow, Curtis)
June 24, 2020 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/4/2020. Rule 26 conference due by 7/20/2020. Signed on 6/18/20 by District Judge M. Douglas Harpool. (View, Pat)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Curtis O. Roggow on behalf of Defendant Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Roggow, Curtis)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jasper County, case number 20AO-CC00116, filed by Curtis O. Roggow on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number BMOWDC-6906556. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal from Jasper County)(Roggow, Curtis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oasis of Joplin v. Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Curtis O. Roggow
Represented By: Sean M. Sturdivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oasis of Joplin
Represented By: Scott G Hunziker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?