Wilburn v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Cesya Wilburn
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Trans Union LLC and Mountain America Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2020cv05094
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of settlement as to Plaintiff's claims against Equifax by Cesya Wilburn (Hernandez, Anthony)
November 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of settlement as to Plaintiff's claims against Mountain America Credit Union by Cesya Wilburn (Hernandez, Anthony)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 11:00 AM before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Richard, Tracey) Amended as to location only.
November 13, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER TO COMPLAINT AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Webb, Danne)
November 13, 2020 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Defendant Experian Information Solutions Inc..(Webb, Danne)
October 28, 2020 Filing 14 Before the Court is Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC's Consent Motion for Extension of Time and Leave to File Out of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Doc. #13). For good cause stated and based on a showing of excusable neglect, the motion is granted. Accordingly, Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC is hereby granted an extension of time until and including November 23, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed on 10/28/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
October 28, 2020 Filing 13 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond and for Leave to File Out of Time Answer filed by Michael Kopp on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/12/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Michael Kopp added to party Equifax Information Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Kopp, Michael)
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 Before the Court is Defendant Experian Information Solution, Inc.'s Consent Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. (Doc. #11). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Defendant Experian Information Solution, Inc. is hereby granted an extension of time until and including November 19, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint. Signed on 10/27/2020 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Richard, Tracey)
October 27, 2020 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/10/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Webb, Danne)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 12/2/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, Kansas City (SRB) before District Judge Stephen R. Bough. Signed on 10/26/20 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Samuel L. Lacy for Experian Information Solutions Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Warren, Melissa)
October 21, 2020 Filing 8 Motion to allow Samuel L. Lacy to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-7106131) filed by Danne Wayne Webb on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Inc.. (Attorney Danne Wayne Webb added to party Experian Information Solutions Inc.(pty:dft))(Webb, Danne)
October 16, 2020 Filing 7 Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Trans Union LLC.(Blair, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Christopher L. Blair for Trans Union LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Berner, Crystal)
October 8, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to allow Christopher L. Blair to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number CMOWDC-7086689) filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union LLC. (Lubben, Todd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC.(Lubben, Todd)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Todd A. Lubben on behalf of Trans Union LLC (Attorney Todd A. Lubben added to party Trans Union LLC(pty:dft))(Lubben, Todd)
September 29, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Mountain America Credit Union, Trans Union LLC. (Woods, Gloria)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Cesya Wilburn against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Mountain America Credit Union, Trans Union LLC filed by Anthony Hernandez on behalf of Cesya Wilburn. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-7068486. Service due by 12/28/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hernandez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilburn v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesya Wilburn
Represented By: Anthony Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Kopp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Samuel L. Lacy
Represented By: Danne Wayne Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Christopher L. Blair
Represented By: Todd A. Lubben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mountain America Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?