Schoenauer v. Saul
Plaintiff: Tina M. Schoenauer
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2020cv05110
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of Social Security complaint on United States Attorney. Summons served on 12/9/2020 Social security answer due by 2/8/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. Record of Submission due by 3/9/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Served: ORC 12/10/20; US Atty 12/9/20; Atty general 12/16/20)(Overton, Kathleen)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Magistrate Assignment Returned by Andrew M. Saul, Tina M. Schoenauer. Jurisdiction by magistrate accepted. ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent)(Melvin, Greg)
December 2, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and emailed to Plaintiff's counsel. (Keller, Jeanne)
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Tina M. Schoenauer. (Filing fee $400 receipt number IFP) filed byKathleen Overton on behalf of Tina M. Schoenauer. Service due by 2/15/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Overton, Kathleen)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORAL ORDER granting #1 Application for Leave to File Action Without Payment of Fees, Costs, or Security, With Affidavit of Financial Status in Support. Plaintiff's counsel shall be responsible for electronically filing the Complaint within 10 days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff shall be responsible for serving process in the manner described in Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(i).Signed on November 17, 2020 by Magistrate Judge Lajuana M. Counts. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Clinton, Erica)
November 16, 2020 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 12/7/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kathleen Overton on behalf of Tina M. Schoenauer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/30/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint)(Attorney Kathleen Overton added to party Tina M. Schoenauer(pty:pla))(Overton, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoenauer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina M. Schoenauer
Represented By: Kathleen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: OGCSSAR7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?