Haskell v. Paccar, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Clayton Haskell
Defendant: Paccar, Inc., Wabco Automotive Control Systems, Inc., WABCO USA, LLC and Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv05067
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: David P Rush
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Defendant Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Defendant Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC's Form due by 10/12/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Agreed Upon Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC's responsive pleading to the Amended Complaint is due on or before 10/1/2021. Signed on 9/2/2021 by Magistrate Judge David P. Rush. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (DO)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer Plaintiff Clayton Haskell and Defendant Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems LLC's Agreed Upon Extension of Time for Bendix to File Responsive Pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stephen L. Beimdiek on behalf of Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Beimdiek, Stephen)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Jeffrey C Klaus on behalf of Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC (Attorney Jeffrey C Klaus added to party Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC(pty:dft))(Klaus, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Stephen L. Beimdiek on behalf of Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC (Attorney Stephen L. Beimdiek added to party Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC(pty:dft))(Beimdiek, Stephen)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Plaintiff's Form due by 9/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Furtak, Rebecca)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Andrew S. Buchanan on behalf of Plaintiff Clayton Haskell. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Buchanan, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to consolidate cases filed by Andrew S. Buchanan on behalf of Clayton Haskell. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Buchanan, Andrew)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Andrew S. Buchanan on behalf of Clayton Haskell.(Buchanan, Andrew)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Clayton Haskell. Waiver sent to Paccar, Inc. on 8/11/2021, answer due 10/12/2021. (Buchanan, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clayton Haskell. Wabco Automotive Control Systems, Inc. served on 8/6/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Buchanan, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clayton Haskell. WABCO USA, LLC served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Buchanan, Andrew)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Clayton Haskell. Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Buchanan, Andrew)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC, WABCO USA, LLC, Wabco Automotive Control Systems, Inc.. Summons e-mailed to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (Furtak, Rebecca)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Keller, Jeanne)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Andrew S. Buchanan on behalf of Clayton Haskell (Buchanan, Andrew)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNMENT as to Plaintiff: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge assignment. Click # here for instructions. Form due by 8/19/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Clayton Haskell Clayton Haskell. Filing fee $402, receipt number AMOWDC-7511923. Service due by 10/25/2021 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Buchanan, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/28/2021: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskell v. Paccar, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clayton Haskell
Represented By: Andrew S. Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paccar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wabco Automotive Control Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WABCO USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Commercial Vehicle Systems, LLC
Represented By: Stephen L. Beimdiek
Represented By: Jeffrey C Klaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?