Springer et al v. State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Randall Springer doing business as Springer Storages LLC doing business as Springer Farms LLC doing business as K-RAC LLC, Jennifer Springer doing business as Springer Storages LLC doing business as Springer Farms LLC doing business as K-RAC LLC and Scott Springer doing business as Springer Storages LLC doing business as Springer Farms LLC doing business as K-RAC LLC
Defendant: State of Missouri, Stone County Missouri, Greene County Missouri, Old Missouri Bank, Mark Harrington, Joey Orr and Jason Whitesell
Case Number: 3:2022cv05060
Filed: August 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2022 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark Harrington, Old Missouri Bank, Joey Orr, Jason Whitesell of Supplemental Notice of Motion to Stay Rule 26 Deadlines and Disovery [Doc. No. 17] and Notice of Electornic Filing filed by Lee J. Viorel on behalf of Defendants Mark Harrington, Old Missouri Bank, Joey Orr, Jason Whitesell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Electronic Filing of Doc. No. 17 (Old Missouri Bank, Mark Harrington, Joey Orr and Jason Whitesell's Motion to Stay Rule 26 Deadlines and Discovery)(Viorel, Lee)
October 6, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION to stay Rule 26 Deadlines and Discovery filed by Lee J. Viorel on behalf of Mark Harrington, Old Missouri Bank, Joey Orr, Jason Whitesell. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/20/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Viorel, Lee)
October 5, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to stay Rule 26 Deadlines and Discovery filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Greene County Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/19/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fax, Nicholas)
October 4, 2022 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of counsel re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF re Certificate of Service of Additional Notice by Lee J. Viorel on behalf of Old Missouri Bank (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Correspondence dated 10-4-2022 to Randolph Springer, Jennifer Springer and Scott Springer mailing additional notice of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Suggestions in Support filed 9-8-2022 request that any Response be filed within 14 days)(Viorel, Lee)
September 27, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of appearance by Kenneth Eckhauser on behalf of Stone County Missouri (Attorney Kenneth Eckhauser added to party Stone County Missouri(pty:dft))(Eckhauser, Kenneth)
September 27, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand on behalf of Stone County Missouri.(Keck, Patricia)
September 27, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Patricia A. Keck on behalf of Stone County Missouri (Attorney Patricia A. Keck added to party Stone County Missouri(pty:dft))(Keck, Patricia)
September 14, 2022 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in support re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant State of Missouri's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Failure to State A Claim, and Sovereign and Official Immunity Suggestions in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Joyce A. Johnson on behalf of Defendant State of Missouri. (Related document(s) #10 ) (Johnson, Joyce)
September 14, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant State of Missouri's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, Failure to State A Claim, and Sovereign and Official Immunity filed by Joyce A. Johnson on behalf of State of Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Johnson, Joyce)
September 8, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Suggestions in Support filed by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Greene County Missouri. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Fax, Nicholas)
September 8, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of appearance by Nicholas Austin Fax on behalf of Greene County Missouri (Attorney Nicholas Austin Fax added to party Greene County Missouri(pty:dft))(Fax, Nicholas)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/10/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 11/22/2022 09:00 AM by telephone before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 9/8/22 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Diefenbach, Tracy) Copy of this order mailed to: Randall Springer, 63 Wheeler Branch Rd, Crane, MO 65633; Jennifer Springer, 63 Wheeler Branch Rd, Crane, MO 65633; and Scott Springer, 2209 Wheeler Branch Rd., Crane, MO 65633.
September 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Joyce A. Johnson on behalf of State of Missouri (Attorney Joyce A. Johnson added to party State of Missouri(pty:dft))(Johnson, Joyce)
September 8, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND SUGGESTIONS IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Lee J. Viorel on behalf of Mark Harrington, Old Missouri Bank, Joey Orr, Jason Whitesell. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/22/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Viorel, Lee)
September 7, 2022 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS of Defendant Old Missouri Bank Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a) filed by Lee J. Viorel on behalf of Defendant Old Missouri Bank.(Viorel, Lee)
September 7, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Aaron M. Klusmeyer on behalf of Mark Harrington, Old Missouri Bank, Joey Orr, Jason Whitesell (Attorney Aaron M. Klusmeyer added to party Mark Harrington (pty:dft), Attorney Aaron M. Klusmeyer added to party Old Missouri Bank(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron M. Klusmeyer added to party Joey Orr(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron M. Klusmeyer added to party Jason Whitesell(pty:dft))(Klusmeyer, Aaron)
September 6, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Lee J. Viorel on behalf of Mark Harrington, Old Missouri Bank, Joey Orr, Jason Whitesell (Attorney Lee J. Viorel added to party Mark Harrington (pty:dft), Attorney Lee J. Viorel added to party Old Missouri Bank(pty:dft), Attorney Lee J. Viorel added to party Joey Orr(pty:dft), Attorney Lee J. Viorel added to party Jason Whitesell(pty:dft))(Viorel, Lee)
September 6, 2022 ***Remark Summonses forwarded to Plaintiffs for completion and service. (Keller, Jeanne)
August 24, 2022 RECEIPT number KCMO096676 in the amount of $402.00 issued to KRAC, LLC on behalf of Jennifer Springer. (Woods, Gloria)
August 22, 2022 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants Scott Springer, Randall Springer, Jennifer Springer. Service due by 11/21/2022 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) NEF mailed to Plaintiffs. $402 check mailed to KC Finance. (Furtak, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springer et al v. State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Springer doing business as Springer Storages LLC doing business as Springer Farms LLC doing business as K-RAC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Springer doing business as Springer Storages LLC doing business as Springer Farms LLC doing business as K-RAC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Springer doing business as Springer Storages LLC doing business as Springer Farms LLC doing business as K-RAC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Missouri
Represented By: Joyce A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stone County Missouri
Represented By: Patricia A. Keck
Represented By: Kenneth Eckhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Missouri
Represented By: Nicholas Austin Fax
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Missouri Bank
Represented By: Aaron M. Klusmeyer
Represented By: Lee J. Viorel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Harrington
Represented By: Aaron M. Klusmeyer
Represented By: Lee J. Viorel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joey Orr
Represented By: Aaron M. Klusmeyer
Represented By: Lee J. Viorel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Whitesell
Represented By: Aaron M. Klusmeyer
Represented By: Lee J. Viorel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?