Royster v. Nichols
Plaintiff: |
William Royster |
Defendant: |
Tommy Nichols, James Corwin, Kansas City Board of Police Commissioners, Karl Zobrist, Terry Brady, Mark Thompson, Mark Funkhouser and James Wilson |
Case Number: |
4:2008cv00141 |
Filed: |
February 28, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Civil Rights: Other Office |
County: |
Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Fernando J. Gaitan |
Nature of Suit: |
Both |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 17, 2013 |
Filing
364
ORDER denying 360 defendant Nichols and Chesley Brown International, Inc.'s motion to enforce court order requiring plaintiff to pay defendants' costs. Signed on 10/17/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
October 3, 2011 |
Filing
347
ORDER that plaintiff's Motion to Remand is DENIED 338 ; Kona Grill and George Rosenkoetters Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED 339 ; plaintiffs Alternative Motion for Reconsideration of the Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Interlocutory Appeal is DENIED as MOOT 344 . Signed on 10/3/11 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
337
ORDER denying 333 plaintiff's MOTION for Interlocutory Appeal. In order that the appeal of this case may proceed, the remaining state law claims against the Kona Grill and George Rosenkoetter must be resolved. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS parties to file dispositive motions on the state law claims on or before June 13, 2011 or file a statement as to why they do not intend to file a dispositive motion. Signed on 5/23/11 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
December 6, 2010 |
Filing
320
ORDER - Kona Macadamia, Inc. (Kona Grill) and George Rosenkoetters Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. # 145) is GRANTED; Highwoods Property Inc.s Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 180) is DENIED AS MOOT; Board of Police Commissioners (Police Board) Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 219) is GRANTED; Chesley Brown International, Inc.(Chesley Brown) and Tommy Nichols Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Doc. # 220) is DENIED AS MOOT ; Tommy Nichols Motion for Summary Judgment (Do c. # 222) is GRANTED; Chesley Browns Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 224) is GRANTED; the Joint Motion to Strike Dr. Poppas Opinions (Doc. # 181) is DENIED AS MOOT; the Joint Motion to Strike Expert Designation, Testimony and Report of Michael Ly man (Doc. # 182) is DENIED AS MOOT ; Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Roger Sommi (Doc. # 183) is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants Expert Stephen Peterson (Doc. # 184) is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Suggestions in Opposition to the Motion to Strike Expert Report of Michael Lyman (Doc. # 192) is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Police Boards Reply in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 235) is GRANTED; Police Boards Motion in Limine (Doc. # 253) is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs Motion to File Sur-Reply in Response to Chesley Browns Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 274) is DENIED; Plaintiffs Motion for Leav e to file Sur-Reply in Response to Tommy Nichols Reply in Support of His Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 277) is DENIED; Plaintiffs Motion in Limine (Doc. # 303) is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs Amended Motion in Limine (Doc. # 304) is DENIED AS MOO T; Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Expert Affidavit Out of Time (Doc. # 305) is DENIED AS MOOT; the Joint Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence (Doc. # 308) is DENIED AS MOOT and Chesley Brown and Officer Nichols Motion in Limine (Doc. # 309) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 12/6/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
November 3, 2010 |
Filing
285
ORDER - Motions terminated: granting 194 MOTION to dismiss party James Corwin and William Holbrook without prejudice. James Corwin and William Holbrook terminated. Signed on 11/3/10 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
January 8, 2010 |
Filing
132
ORDER granting Highwoods's Motion to file Cross-Claims Against Kona Grill and Chesley Brown 102 and denying Highwoodss 110 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. on 1/8/10. (Enss, Rhonda)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?