Mayo et al v. GMAC Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: |
Michael D Mayo and Sharron Mayo |
Defendant: |
GMAC Mortgage LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2008cv00568 |
Filed: |
August 7, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Truth in Lending Office |
County: |
Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Greg Kays |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 21, 2012 |
Filing
322
ORDER denying 296 motion to certify class. Signed on September 21, 2012 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Lehr, Jonathan)
|
January 13, 2012 |
Filing
291
ORDER reversing the Court's previously entered partially summary judgment order. The award of summary judgment in favor RFC and GMACM on all claims is reversed. The injunction entered December 16, 2011, is extended until further order of this Court. Plaintiff shall file a revised motion for class certification and brief in support on or before February 13, 2012. Signed on 1/13/12 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
December 16, 2011 |
Filing
285
ORDER granting 278 defendants' motion for order to show cause. An injunction is entered against Mayo and his attorneys. Plaintiff Mayo and his wife, and anyone acting on his behalf, are enjoined for 30 days from any activity or participation i n the Shokere lawsuit which might adjudicate or settle their claim, or from filing any similar lawsuit against GMACM and RFC in any other court, without the prior written approval of this Court. Defendants UBS and Deutsche Bank collectively shall post a surety bond in the amount of $5,000 within seven days. In the alternative to posting a surety bond, they may deposit in the Court registry $5,000. Signed on 12/16/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
August 10, 2011 |
Filing
271
ORDER denying 269 motion to stay briefing schedule. Signed on 8/10/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
July 26, 2011 |
Filing
263
ORDER denying 259 Plaintiff's motion to stay. Signed on 7/26/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
July 1, 2011 |
Filing
256
ORDER denying 169 Plaintiff Michael Mayo's motion to certify class. Signed on 7/1/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
March 25, 2011 |
Filing
250
ORDER re 169 motion to certify class. The Court ORDERS the parties to submit additional briefing on two issues: (1) an amended proposed class definition; and (2) whether an appropriately defined class would be sufficiently numerous to make joinder of all members impracticable. Signed on 3/25/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
February 9, 2011 |
Filing
248
ORDER denying 244 plaintiff's motion for reconsideration. Signed on 2/9/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
January 13, 2011 |
Filing
243
ORDER granting in part 173 174 177 defendants' motions for summary judgment. All claims against Defendants GMAC Mortgage, LLC and Residential Funding Company, LLC are dismissed with prejudice. Signed on 1/13/11 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?