Yunis et al v. Ferrellgas, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: |
Peter Yunis and David Goldman |
Defendant: |
Ferrellgas, L.P., Ferrellgas, Inc., Ferrellgas Partners, L.P., Amerigas Propane, L.P., AmeriGas Propane, Inc., Amerigas Eagle Propane, L.P. and Amerigas Partners, L.P. |
Case Number: |
4:2009cv00918 |
Filed: |
November 16, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Kansas City Office |
County: |
Unknown |
Presiding Judge: |
Gary A. Fenner |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 13, 2009 |
Filing
17
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) by The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation TRANSFERRING CASE to the United States District Court for the Western District of Missouri & Assigned to the Honorable Gary A. Fenner for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1407, MDL No. 2086 & Case No. 09-CV-0918. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2009) [Transferred from cand on 11/16/2009.]
|
September 29, 2009 |
Filing
15
ORDER of Dismissal of plaintiff Darren Whitlock without prejudice. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 09/29/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009) [Transferred from cand on 11/16/2009.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Yunis et al v. Ferrellgas, L.P. et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Peter Yunis |
Represented By: |
Eric B Snyder |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: David Goldman |
Represented By: |
Eric B Snyder |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ferrellgas, L.P. |
Represented By: |
Peter W. Herzog, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ferrellgas, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Peter W. Herzog, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Ferrellgas Partners, L.P. |
Represented By: |
Peter W. Herzog, III |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, L.P. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: AmeriGas Propane, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amerigas Eagle Propane, L.P. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Amerigas Partners, L.P. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?