Wright v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: |
Stuart Wright |
Defendant: |
United States of America, John Clark, Walter R Bradley, Sean Franklin and Deputy United States Marshals 1-10 |
Case Number: |
4:2010cv01220 |
Filed: |
December 9, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Kansas City Office |
County: |
Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Sarah W. Hays |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 18, 2017 |
Filing
136
ORDER granting the defendant's Motion of the United States to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment on the Remaining Common Law Tort Claims (doc. # 115 ). Signed on May 18, 2017 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Clinton, Erica)
|
September 16, 2014 |
Filing
104
ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment 49 as remanded is granted in part and denied in part. That portion of the motion seeking summary judgment as to plaintiff's claim against defendants Sean Franklin and Christopher Wallace for false arrest is granted. That portion of the motion seeking summary judgment as to plaintiff's claims against defendants Sean Franklin and Christopher Wallace for excessive force and improper search and seizure is denied. It is further ORDERED that Pl aintiff's Alternative Motion 96 is granted in part and denied in part. That portion of the motion seeking a denial of defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted to the extent that the Court has found that defendants Franklin and Wallace are not entitled to summary judgment on plaintiff's Bivens claims of excessive force and improper search and seizure. The remainder of the motion is denied. Signed on 9/16/2014 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Bliss, Sue)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing
76
ORDER - ORDERED that the Motion of the Individual Capacity Defendants to Dismiss Count IV ofPlaintiffs First Amended Complaint or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment (doc #49) isgranted in part and denied in part. That portion of the motion see king a dismissal of claims againstdefendants John Clark and Walter Bradley is granted. That portion of the motion seeking summaryjudgment as to plaintiffs claims against defendants Sean Franklin and Christopher Wallace isdenied. It is furtherORDERED that Plaintiffs Alternative Motion (doc #56) is granted in part and denied in part.That portion of the motion seeking a denial of defendants motion to dismiss/summary judgment is granted to the extent that the Court has found that defendants Franklin and Wallace are not entitledto summary judgment on plaintiffs Bivens claims of false arrest, improper search and seizure andexcessive force. The remainder of the motion is denied. Signed on 9/6/2012 by Magistrate Judge Sarah W. Hays. (Gicinto, JoRita)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?