IHOP IP, LLC et al v. International House of Prayer et al Featured Case

The International House of Pancakes a/k/a IHOP is suing the International House of Prayer for trademark infringement again, after attempts to try mediating their dispute from a previous case fail.

Plaintiff: IHOP IP, LLC and International House of Pancakes, LLC
Defendant: International House of Prayer, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., Shiloh Ministries, Inc., International House of Prayer East Bay and Mike Bickle
Case Number: 4:2011cv00548
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: John T. Maughmer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2012 Filing 59 Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL. On the 4th day of June, 2012, the parties having filed a Stipulation of Dismissal 58 pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), it is hereby ORDERED that the above cause of action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. AT THE DIRECTION OF THE COURT, Ann Thompson, Clerk of Court. by Renea Kanies, Courtroom Deputy. (TEXT ENTRY ONLY - NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED) (Kanies, Renea)
June 4, 2012 Filing 58 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Iba, Mark)
April 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey denying 56 Joint MOTION for order to Renew Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
March 30, 2012 Filing 56 Joint MOTION for order to Renew Consent to the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tassi, Elizabeth)
March 19, 2012 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc. regarding Answers to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories and Responses to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents filed by Keith J. Grady on behalf of Defendants Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc..(Grady, Keith)
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Plaintiff's Motion to amend initial summons and strike certain affirmative defenses [Doc. # 44] 44 is DENIED as moot. The motion pertained only to Defendant Prayer Furnace, Inc., which is no longer a party to this suit. [Doc. # 51]. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Smith, Fran)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 52 motion for extension of time of expert designations. Expert designations and depositions will be as follows: a. On or before July 30, 2012, Plaintiffs will designate any expertwitness they intend to call at trial. This includes any person who may presentevidence under Rules 702, 703 or 705 of the Federal Rules of Evidence. b. On or before August 29, 2012, Defendants will designate any expert witness they intend to call at trial. This includes any person who may present evidence under Rules 702, 703 or 705 of the Federal Rules of Evidence. c. On or before October 31, 2012 all depositions of expert witnesses will be completed. [This deadline is unchanged]. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
February 27, 2012 Filing 52 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadlines filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/15/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tassi, Elizabeth)
February 22, 2012 Filing 51 CLERK'S ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Defendant The Prayer Furnace, Inc., only. The parties having filed a Stipulation of Dismissal 50 pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action be, and hereby is dismissed as to The Prayer Furnace, Inc. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
February 21, 2012 Filing 50 STIPULATION of dismissal by IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. (Tassi, Elizabeth)
February 16, 2012 Filing 49 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re 44 MOTION to amend/correct Summons Issued to International House of Prayer East Bay MOTION to strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of Plaintiffs IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. (Related document(s) 44 ) (Tassi, Elizabeth)
February 8, 2012 Filing 48 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Diane L. Waters on behalf of Defendant the Prayer Furnace, Inc.(Waters, Diane)
February 2, 2012 Filing 47 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 44 MOTION to amend/correct Summons Issued to International House of Prayer East Bay MOTION to strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Diane L. Waters on behalf of Defendant the Prayer Furnace, Inc. Reply suggestions due by 2/21/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 44 ) (Waters, Diane)
January 30, 2012 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by the Prayer Furnace, Inc filed by Diane L. Waters on behalf of Defendant the Prayer Furnace, Inc.(Waters, Diane)
January 27, 2012 Filing 45 SUGGESTIONS in support re 44 MOTION to amend/correct Summons Issued to International House of Prayer East Bay MOTION to strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Mark McKay Iba on behalf of Plaintiffs IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jeanne M. Kosta)(Related document(s) 44 ) (Iba, Mark)
January 27, 2012 Filing 44 MOTION to amend/correct Summons Issued to International House of Prayer East Bay, MOTION to strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Mark McKay Iba on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/13/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s)[]) (Iba, Mark)
January 23, 2012 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by the Prayer Furnace, Inc filed by Diane L. Waters on behalf of Defendant the Prayer Furnace, Inc.(Waters, Diane)
January 11, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of appearance by Karen Zelle on behalf of Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc. (Zelle, Karen)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 40 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend the Return of Service and Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Kanies, Renea)
January 9, 2012 Filing 40 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Amend the Return of Service and Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/26/2012 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tassi, Elizabeth)
January 4, 2012 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by the Prayer Furnace, Inc filed by Diane L. Waters on behalf of Defendant the Prayer Furnace, Inc.(Waters, Diane)
December 23, 2011 Filing 38 ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc..(Grady, Keith)
December 23, 2011 Filing 37 NOTICE of appearance by Diane L. Waters on behalf of the Prayer Furnace, Inc (Waters, Diane)
December 23, 2011 Filing 36 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by the Prayer Furnace, Inc. (Waters, Diane)
December 23, 2011 Filing 35 ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint, on behalf of the Prayer Furnace, Inc.(Waters, Diane)
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. Section C(1) of the Amended Scheduling Order 31 is amended as follows: "Absent extraordinary circumstances, all discovery motions will be filed on or before October 1, 2012." This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Kanies, Renea)
December 14, 2011 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, International House of Prayer East Bay, Shiloh Ministries, Inc. filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Tassi, Elizabeth)
December 14, 2011 Filing 32 RULES OF TRIAL entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey. (Kanies, Renea)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey: Discovery due by 10/31/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 11/30/2012. Pretrial Conference set for 3/28/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City. (Attachments: # 1 Memo on PTC) (Kanies, Renea)
December 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette Laughrey granting 22 motion for protective order; granting 27 motion for leave to file second amended complaint. Plaintiff shall file the second amended complaint on ECF within three days of this Order. (Kanies, Renea)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed on 12/7/11 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Beard, Melanie)
December 5, 2011 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC Plaintiffs First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant The Prayer Furnace, Inc. d/b/a International House of Prayer East Bay and Plaintiffs First Interrogatories to Defendant The Prayer Furnace, Inc. d/b/a International House of Prayer East Bay filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of Plaintiffs IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC.(Tassi, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2011 Filing 27 MOTION for leave to file Second Amended Complaint filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/19/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint)(Tassi, Elizabeth)
December 2, 2011 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents to Defendants International House of Prayer, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc. and Shiloh Ministries, Inc., First Interrogatories to Defendants International House of Prayer, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., and Shiloh Ministries, Inc., First Request for Production of Documents to Defendant Mike Bickle, and First Interrogatories to Defendant Mike Bickle filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of Plaintiffs IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC.(Tassi, Elizabeth)
November 23, 2011 Filing 25 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT from Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer to Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. The correct case number is 11-0548-CV-W-FJG. Please change your records to reflect this assignment. (Rowland, Bonnie)
November 22, 2011 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure by International House of Prayer East Bay (Waters, Diane) Modified on 11/23/2011 to correct docket text (Melvin, Greg).
November 21, 2011 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Diane L. Waters, counsel for International House of Prayer East Bay. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 12/15/2011 (Rowland, Bonnie)
November 15, 2011 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Keith J. Grady on behalf of Defendants Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc..(Grady, Keith)
November 15, 2011 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/2/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Tassi, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2011 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of Plaintiffs IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC.(Tassi, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of appearance by Diane L. Waters on behalf of International House of Prayer East Bay (Waters, Diane)
November 15, 2011 Filing 19 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by International House of Prayer East Bay. (Waters, Diane)
November 15, 2011 Filing 18 ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint, on behalf of International House of Prayer East Bay.(Waters, Diane)
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. International House of Prayer East Bay shall have up to and including 11/15/11 to file -- through counsel -- its answer or otherwise responsive pleading. The Court will not accept any further filings on behalf of International House of Prayer East Bay except those made through counsel. Signed on 10/31/11 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached.(Alexander, Pam) Modified on 10/31/2011 to correct typographical error and to reflect fact that copy of the docket text entry mailed to International House of Prayer East Bay, Jim Stilwell, Director, 471 San Diego Place, San Ramon, CA 94583 on 11/1/11. (Alexander, Pam).
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER: #1 case for Jury Trial set for 3/18/2013 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7E, Kansas City. Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2013 at 2:00 PM in Chambers. See Order for deadlines. Signed on 10/25/11 by Magistrate Judge John T. Maughmer. (Rollheiser, Sandy)
October 24, 2011 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re 14 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of Plaintiffs IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 11/10/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court (Related document(s) 14 ) (Tassi, Elizabeth)
October 20, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re 1 Complaint, filed by International House of Prayer East Bay. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/7/2011 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) 1 ) (Wheeler, LaTandra)
October 12, 2011 Filing 13 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery Schedule and Trial Order by IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. (Tassi, Elizabeth)
September 29, 2011 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of 3 AMENDED complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. Complaint mailed to International House of Prayer East Bay on 9/23/2011. (Iba, Mark) Modified on 9/29/2011 to create relationship to document # 3 . (Moore, Terri). Modified on 9/30/2011 to correct docket text o reflect that plaintiff mailed document to party on 9/23/2011. International House of Prayer East Bay was not served on 9/23/2011. (Jones, Robin)
September 21, 2011 SUMMONS ISSUED as to International House of Prayer East Bay. (Martin, Jan)
August 17, 2011 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT emailed to Keith Grady, Lauren Tucker McCubbin and John Challis, counsel for defendants International House of Prayer, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., Shiloh Ministries, Inc. and Mike Bickle. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 9/12/2011 (Rowland, Bonnie)
August 16, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Lauren E. Tucker McCubbin on behalf of Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc. (McCubbin, Lauren)
August 15, 2011 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by John M Challis on behalf of Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc. (Challis, John)
August 15, 2011 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Keith J. Grady on behalf of Defendant Shiloh Ministries, Inc..(Grady, Keith)
August 15, 2011 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Keith J. Grady on behalf of Defendant Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc..(Grady, Keith)
August 15, 2011 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Keith J. Grady on behalf of Defendant International House of Prayer.(Grady, Keith)
August 15, 2011 Filing 6 ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Mike Bickle, Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, Shiloh Ministries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A, # 2 Ex. B)(Grady, Keith)
June 27, 2011 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark D. Hinderks on behalf of Plaintiffs IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC.(Hinderks, Mark)
June 22, 2011 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. as to all Defendants. Answer due 8/15/11(Hinderks, Mark) Modified on 6/23/2011 to add answer due date to text (Rowland, Bonnie).
June 14, 2011 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, International House of Prayer East Bay, Shiloh Ministries, Inc., Mike Bickle filed by Elizabeth A. Tassi on behalf of IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Tassi, Elizabeth)
May 31, 2011 Filing 2 Notice of EAP assignment to an outside mediator sent via electronic notice to plaintiffs' counsel. (Attachments: # 1 EAP General Order)(Martin, Jan)
May 31, 2011 ***Remark: Email notification of initiating event to Patent & Trademark office. (Martin, Jan)
May 31, 2011 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT sent via email to plaintiffs' counsel. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 6/24/2011 (Martin, Jan)
May 27, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc., International House of Prayer, International House of Prayer East Bay, Shiloh Ministries, Inc. filed by Mark D. Hinderks on behalf of IHOP IP, LLC, International House of Pancakes, LLC. Filing fee $350, receipt number 0866-2730517. Service due by 9/29/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hinderks, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IHOP IP, LLC et al v. International House of Prayer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IHOP IP, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Hinderks
Represented By: Mark McKay Iba
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Tassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International House of Pancakes, LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Hinderks
Represented By: Mark McKay Iba
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Tassi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International House of Prayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends of the Bridegroom, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shiloh Ministries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International House of Prayer East Bay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Bickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?