January 23, 2018 |
Filing
309
ORDER denying (350) plaintiffs' motion to compel; and granting (348), (355), (367) motions for protective order in case 4:12-md-02361-FJG. Signed on 1/23/18 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Associated Cases: 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 4:12-cv- 00308-FJG, 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 4:12-cv-00963-FJG, 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 4:14-cv-00645-FJG(Enss, Rhonda)
|
July 24, 2017 |
Filing
266
ORDER granting in part plaintiffs' (280) sealed motion for class certification in case 4:12-md-02361-FJG [(224) in case 4:12-cv-00308-FJG; (220) in case 4:12-cv-00765-FJG; (229) in case 4:12-cv-00766-FJG; (216) in case 4:12-cv-00769-FJG; (214) i n case 4:12-cv-00770-FJG; (226) in case 4:12-cv-00771-FJG; (224) in case 4:12-cv-00789-FJG; (224) in case 4:12-cv-00790-FJG; (201) in case 4:12-cv-00931-FJG; (199) in case 4:12-cv-00932-FJG; (198) in case 4:12-cv-00963-FJG; (210) in case 4:12-cv-00 994-FJG; (226) in case 4:12-cv-01247-FJG; (196) in case 4:13-cv-00080-FJG; and (168) in case 4:14-cv-00645-FJG]. The Court certifies an issues class pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(c)(4). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g), the Court appoints Norman E. Siegel as Liaison Class Counsel and Stephen A. Weiss, James E. Cecchi, and Kim Richman as Class Counsel under Rule 23(g). Paul Wieczorek, Cheryl DAloia, John Albert Veal, Jr., Randall Davis, Kirk Yee, Jeremy M. Dasaro, and Carole Sovocool, are app ointed class representatives. The Court ORDERS plaintiffs to submit their proposed notice on or before August 17, 2017. Defendant may file its objections, if any, on or before August 31, 2017. Plaintiffs may reply to the objections on or before Se ptember 14, 2017. Signed on 7/24/17 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Associated Cases: 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 4:12-cv-00308-FJG, 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 4:12-cv-00963-FJG, 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 4:14-cv-00645-FJG(Enss, Rhonda)
|
February 8, 2016 |
Filing
158
ORDER - both parties' motions for summary judgment 108 and 115 are DENIED. Additionally, the Court finds that any ruling on the motions to strike expert testimony would be premature given the questions of fact remaining in this case. Those motions 113 and 120 are DENIED. Parties are to meet and confer to develop a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan, which shall be filed with the Court on or before 2/26/16. If the parties cannot agree on particular aspects of the Proposed Plan, they sho uld file a statement indicating the aspects upon which they disagree and setting forth their respective positions.[64 in 4:12-cv-00963-FJG, 59 in 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 89 in 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 67 in 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 92 in 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 89 in 4:12 -cv-00308-FJG, 81 in 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 120 in 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 90 in 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 80 in 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 84 in 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 65 in 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 31 in 4:14-cv-00645-FJG, 75 in 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 89 in 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 91 in 4:1 2-cv-00771-FJG) MOTION for Order (SEALED); 115 in 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 75 in 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 86 in 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 70 in 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 84 in 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 76 in 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 60 in 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 87 in 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 62 i n 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 54 in 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 26 in 4:14-cv-00645-FJG, 79 in 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 84 in 4:12-cv-00308-FJG, 84 in 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 85 in 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 59 in 4:12-cv-00963-FJG) MOTION for Order (SEALED), (82 in 4:12-cv-00308-FJG, 57 in 4:12-cv-00963-FJG, 74 in 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 73 in 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 113 in 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 83 in 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 77 in 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 60 in 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 82 in 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 58 in 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 85 in 4:12-cv-00766-FJG , 82 in 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 84 in 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 52 in 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 68, (72 in 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 52 in 4:12-cv-00963-FJG, 53 in 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 77 in 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 55 in 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 80 in 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 78 in 4:12-cv-0124 7-FJG, 77 in 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 68 in 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 69 in 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 108 in 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 63 in 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 79 in 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 47 in 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 77 in 4:12-cv-00308-FJG, 19 in 4:14-cv-00645-FJG) MOTION for Orde r (SEALED)]. Signed on 2/8/16 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Associated Cases: 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 4:12-cv-00308-FJG, 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 4:12-cv-00963-FJG, 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 4:14-cv-00645-FJG(Enss, Rhonda)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
121
ORDER granting (136) plaintiffs' Sealed Motion. Parties to complete discovery on an expedited basis on or before 6/23/15. Documents (108) motion for summary judgment, (113) Sealed Motion, (115) Sealed Motion, and (120) Sealed Motion in case 4: 12-md-02361-FJG are denied w/o prejudice to supplementation upon completion of the expedited discovery. Once discovery is complete, the Court will reopen the motions for summary judgment and motions to strike expert testimony and will set deadlines f or filing supplements to same. [denying (77) Sealed Motion.; denying (82) Sealed Motion.; denying (84) Sealed Motion.; denying (89) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00308-FJG; denying (72) Sealed Motion.; denying (77) Sealed Motion.; denying (79 ) Sealed Motion.; denying (84) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00765-FJG; denying (80) Sealed Motion.; denying (85) Sealed Motion.; denying (87) Sealed Motion.; denying (92) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00766-FJG; denying (69) Sealed Motion.; denying (74) Sealed Motion.; denying (76) Sealed Motion.; denying (81) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00769-FJG; denying (68) Sealed Motion.; denying (73) Sealed Motion.; denying (75) Sealed Motion.; denying (80) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-c v-00770-FJG; denying (79) Sealed Motion.; denying (84) Sealed Motion.; denying (86) Sealed Motion.; denying (91) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00771-FJG; denying (77) Sealed Motion.; denying (82) Sealed Motion.; denying (84) Sealed Motion.; d enying (89) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00789-FJG; denying (77) Sealed Motion.; denying (82) Sealed Motion.; denying (84) Sealed Motion.; denying (89) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00790-FJG; denying (55) Sealed Motion.; denying (60) Seale d Motion.; denying (62) Sealed Motion.; denying (67) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00931-FJG; denying (53) Sealed Motion.; denying (58) Sealed Motion.; denying (60) Sealed Motion.; denying (65) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00932-FJG; denying (52) Sealed Motion.; denying (57) Sealed Motion.; denying (59) Sealed Motion.; denying (64) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00963-FJG; denying (63) Sealed Motion.; denying (68) Sealed Motion.; denying (70) Sealed Motion.; denying (75) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-00994-FJG; denying (78) Sealed Motion.; denying (83) Sealed Motion.; denying (85) Sealed Motion.; denying (90) Sealed Motion. in case 4:12-cv-01247-FJG; denying (47) Sealed Motion.; denying (52) Sealed Motion.; denying ( 54) Sealed Motion.; denying (59) Sealed Motion. in case 4:13-cv-00080-FJG; denying (31) Sealed Motion.; denying (19) Sealed Motion.; denying (24) Sealed Motion.; denying (26) Sealed Motion. in case 4:14-cv-00645-FJG]. Signed on 4/23/15 by Dis trict Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Associated Cases: 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 4:12-cv-00308-FJG, 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 4:12-cv-00963-FJG, 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 4:13-cv-00080-FJG, 4:14-cv-00645-FJG(Enss, Rhonda)
|
March 1, 2013 |
Filing
41
ORDER - denying defendants' motion to dismiss. Motions terminated: (22 in 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 31 in 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 26 in 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 26 in 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 14 in 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 16 in 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 33 in 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 30 in 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 17 in 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 31 in 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 23 in 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 30 in 4:12-cv-00308-FJG). Proposed scheduling order due 4/1/2013. Signed on 3/1/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. Associated Cases : 4:12-md-02361-FJG, 4:12-cv-00308-FJG, 4:12-cv-00765-FJG, 4:12-cv-00766-FJG, 4:12-cv-00769-FJG, 4:12-cv-00770-FJG, 4:12-cv-00771-FJG, 4:12-cv-00789-FJG, 4:12-cv-00790-FJG, 4:12-cv-00931-FJG, 4:12-cv-00932-FJG, 4:12-cv-00994-FJG, 4:12-cv-01247-FJG, 4:13-cv-00080-FJG(Enss, Rhonda)
|