RPM Performance Coatings Group, Inc. et al v. Fredrick
Plaintiff: |
RPM Performance Coatings Group, Inc. and Stonhard, a division of StonCor Group, Inc. |
Defendant: |
William G Fredrick |
Case Number: |
4:2012cv01392 |
Filed: |
November 26, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of Missouri |
Office: |
Kansas City Office |
County: |
Jackson |
Presiding Judge: |
Fernando J. Gaitan |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1346 Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 12, 2013 |
Filing
36
ORDER that plaintiffs are awarded final judgment against defendant in the amount of $21,838.60, plus attorneys' fees and costs in the amount of $16,668.90, for a total amount of $38.507.50.It is FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of t he court mail a copy of this Order via regular and certified mail to defendant. Signed on 11/12/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) A copy of this order and Doc. 37, clerk's judgment, was sent by regular and certified mail (article no. 7013 1710 00005617 6148) to William Fredrick, 1003 NE Clear Creek Dr., Grain Valley, MO 64029-9182 on 11/12/2013 (Melvin, Greg)
|
March 18, 2013 |
Filing
27
ORDER denying 23 defendant's motion for reconsideration and granting 24 plaintiffs' motion for default. A Permanent Injunction shall enter in this matter, pursuant to Defendant's Terms and Conditions of Employment. This Injunction shall begin on the date of this Order and remain in effect for a period of one year. Although Plaintiffs request a hearing on monetary damages (including attorneys fees), the Court believes the better way to proceed is for Plaintiffs to file a brief specifying exactly what amounts of monetary damages they believe they are entitled to. Plaintiffs brief on monetary damages shall be filed on or before April 5, 2013. Defendant may file a response to plaintiffs' brief on monetary damages on or b efore April 23, 2013. Thereafter, the Court will issue its order specifying the amount of monetary damagesawardable in this case. Clerk directed to mail a copy of this Order via regular and certified mail to defendant. Signed on 3/18/13 by Chief Dist rict Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) A copy of this order was sent via regular and certified mail (article no. 7001 0360 0003 3498 2802) to William Fredrick, 1003 NE Clear Creek Dr., Grain Valley, MO 64029-9182 on 3/18/2013. (Melvin, Greg)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 17 plaintiffs' motion for entry of default. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file a motion for default judgment pursuant to Rule 55(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on or before 02/01/13. Furthermore, as defendant is in d efault and plaintiffs' requested relief can be granted in an order on default judgment, the Court finds that the preliminary injunction hearing set for Friday, January 11, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. is unnecessary. Therefore, said hearing will be CA NCELLED. Clerk to mail a copy of this Order via regular and certified mail to defendant. Signed on 1/10/13 by Chief District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Enss, Rhonda) ***Modified on 1/10/2013 to reflect that a copy of the order was sent via r egular and certified mail, tracking #7001 0360 0003 3498 1089 to William Fredrick, 1003 NE Clear Creek Dr., Grain Valley, MO 64029-9182. (Wheeler, LaTandra). Modified on 1/10/2013 to note copy of order emailed to defendant at personal email address and voice mail left on defendant's cell phone (Enss, Rhonda).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?