Faltermeier v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: David Faltermeier
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2015cv00491
Filed: June 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER DETERMINING COSTS. Signed on 10/24/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting 132 Defendant's motion for summary judgment and denying without prejudice 134 Plaintiff's motion for class certification. Signed on 3/24/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 motion to dismiss. Defendant's motion to dismiss is granted with respect to MMPA claims as they relate to statements that are mere puffery. In all other parts, Defendant's motion to dismiss is denied. Signed on 9/13/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER - Defendant's motion for relief 109 is denied and Plaintiff's motion to strike 115 is granted in part. Signed on 8/25/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Order Appointing Special Master. The Court now refers Defendant's pending Motion to Compel (Doc. 111 ) to the Special Master for a recommendation. Signed on 8/18/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel shall be allowed to be present at the July 13, 2016, vehicle inspection. Signed on 7/5/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed on 6/6/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER CLARIFYING DENIAL OF REMAND. Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Stay to File Motion for Reconsideration and for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Doc. 84 ) is denied. The stay imposed is lifted, and the May 10, 2016, discovery teleconference is rescheduled for June 1, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. No additional briefing for the discovery teleconference is required. Signed on 5/26/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 61 Plaintiff's motion to amend complaint; denying as moot 13 Defendant's motion to dismiss. Plaintiff is ordered to file his new complaint within seven days of this Order. The stay recently imposed by this Court (Doc. 59 ) is hereby lifted. Signed on 3/8/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
February 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying 8 Plaintiff's motion to remand; denying 11 Defendant's motion to transfer case. Signed on 2/10/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Faltermeier v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Faltermeier
Represented By: Brenda G. Hamilton
Represented By: David Lee Heinemann
Represented By: Stephen J. Moore
Represented By: Christopher S. Shank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. D'Aunoy
Represented By: John W. Rogers
Represented By: Kathy Ann Wisniewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?