Sunflower Redevelopment, LLC v. Illinois Union Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sunflower Redevelopment, LLC
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv00577
Filed: July 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 219 motion in limine. Signed on 7/12/2018 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
June 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER granting 205 motion for partial summary judgment; denying 211 motion for partial summary judgment. Signed on 6/25/2018 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Law Clerk)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE. Signed on 3/28/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting in part 125 motion in limine. Signed on 3/16/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER - The dispositive motion deadline is amended to December 1, 2017. Suggestions in opposition are due on or before December 22, 2017, and reply suggestions are due on or before January 3, 2018. Absent extraordinary circumstances, no further ex tensions will be granted. The page limit for suggestions in support and in opposition is limited to twenty-five pages, and reply suggestions are limited to ten pages, as calculated by Local Rule 7.0. The Court will not review any material exceeding this page limit. Signed on 11/20/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Signed on 11/9/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 55 motion for summary judgment and 57 motion for partial summary judgment. Signed on 5/2/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 23 motion for reconsideration and certification for interlocutory appeal. Signed on 3/28/16 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Francis, Alexandra)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sunflower Redevelopment, LLC v. Illinois Union Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunflower Redevelopment, LLC
Represented By: Lauren E. Tucker McCubbin
Represented By: Lisa A. Weixelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois Union Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert William Cotter
Represented By: Matthew William Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?