Campbell v. City of Concordia et al
Plaintiff: Brian Campbell
Defendant: City of Concordia, Concordia Police Department, Aaron Rucker and Jim Lynn
Case Number: 4:2016cv00671
Filed: June 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Lafayette
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER AND OPINION (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT CONCORDIA POLICE DEPARTMENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER, AND (3) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ORDER INVESTIGATION INTO PENDING CRIMINAL CHARGES. Signed on 6/9/17 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) 48 Order and 49 Judgment sent via regular and certified mail, 7012 3460 0001 7395 9313, return receipt requested to Brian Campbell, 668 NE 110 Road, Knob Noster, MO, 65336, on 6/9/17. Modified on 6/9/2017 (Crocker, Susan).
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER (1) DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANTS RUCKER AND LYNN WITHOUT PREJUDICE, (2) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND (3) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S "PETITION". Signed on 5/17/17 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Order mailed to Plaintiff.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO RELEASE IRS RECORDS. Signed on 4/25/17 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Modified on 4/25/2017 to reflect a copy of this order was mailed via regular mail to Brian Campbell 668 NE 110 Rd. Knob Noster, MO 65336. (Travis, Kendra)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. City of Concordia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Concordia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Concordia Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Lynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?