Birmingham v. Pash
Defendant: Ronda J. Pash
Petitioner: Terry V. Birmingham
Case Number: 4:2016cv00965
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D. Smith
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER (1) DENYING PETITIONER'S SECOND FORMAL REQUEST FOR A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, (2) CONSTRUING REQUEST AS MOTION TO REOPEN TIME TO FILE APPEAL, AND (3) DENYING PETITIONERS REQUEST TO REOPEN TIME TO FILE APPEAL. Signed on 8/23/17 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea) Copy mailed on 8/23/2017 to Terry Birmingham, 1115 East Pence Road, Cameron MO 64429 (Houston, Kiambu).
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING PETITIONER'S REQUEST SEEKING A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, 17 . Signed on 6/29/17 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Order mailed to Terry Birmingham.) (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND OPINION (1) DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS, (2) DENYING ISSUANCE OF CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY, AND (3) DISMISSING MATTER WITH PREJUDICE. Signed on 4/3/17 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birmingham v. Pash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Terry V. Birmingham
Represented By: Mark A. Hammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronda J. Pash
Represented By: Andrew J Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?