Phox v. Virtuoso Sourcing Group LLC
Plaintiff: LaRonda Phox
Defendant: Virtuoso Sourcing Group LLC
Case Number: 4:2017cv00098
Filed: February 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed on 9/22/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) Modified on 9/22/2017 - Mailed to Plaintiff. (Strodtman, Tracy)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO PAY A FILING FEE IN FUTURE CASES. Signed on 9/21/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. Copy mailed to Plaintiff. (Strodtman, Tracy)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order directing Plaintiff to comply with the Court's June 29th Order on or before August 25, 2017. Signed on 8/8/17 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy) Modified on 8/8/2017 - Mailed to Plaintiff. (Strodtman, Tracy)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phox v. Virtuoso Sourcing Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaRonda Phox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtuoso Sourcing Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?