Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation v. Macapagal et al

Plaintiff: Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation
Defendant: Amber Macapagal and Gilbert Macapagal
Case Number: 4:2018cv00618
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Missouri Western District Court
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Clay
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Student Loan
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2018 4 Clerk's ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice, pursuant to #3 Notice of Dismissal. this is a text entry only. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
September 26, 2018 3 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation (Bork, N.)
August 14, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amber Macapagal, Gilbert Macapagal. (Woods, Gloria)
August 14, 2018 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 13, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by N. Larry Bork on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5890679. Service due by 11/13/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8-19-17 Withholding Order, #2 Exhibit 10-19-17 Second Notice, #3 Exhibit 11-21-17 Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit 3-20-18 Final Demand)(Bork, N.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation v. Macapagal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Guaranteed Student Loan Corporation
Represented By: N. Larry Bork
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Macapagal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Macapagal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?