Horwitz et al v. Skinny IT Corp et al
Plaintiff: Jamkor, Inc. and Jacob Horwitz
Defendant: Installation and Service Technologies, Inc., Sam M. Darwish and Skinny IT Corp
Case Number: 4:2018cv00629
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Brian C Wimes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jacob Horwitz, Jamkor, Inc. filed by Angus White Dwyer on behalf of Plaintiffs Jacob Horwitz, Jamkor, Inc..(Dwyer, Angus)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PARTIAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND RULES OF TRIAL: Final Pretrial Teleconference set for 11/14/2019 at 2:30 p.m. Parties will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail at a later date. Jury Trial set for 12/16/2019 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. ** Additional scheduling order to issue once the parties have conferred and provided the Court with proposed dates for certain deadlines. Signed on 10/10/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 10, 2018 Filing 15 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: SCHEDULING TELECONFERENCE held on 10/10/2018; order to issue. Based on the statements of counsel, the parties shall confer and file with the Court an amended proposed scheduling order on or before November 2, 2018. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Time in court: 11:30 a.m. to 11:45 a.m.To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Jean Crawford, 816-512-5642. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 It is ORDERED Defendants' Motion for extension of time to file answer (Doc. #6) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 10/10/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
October 9, 2018 Filing 13 PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND JOINT PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN by Jacob Horwitz, Jamkor, Inc.. (Dwyer, Angus)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 IT IS ORDERED Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #11) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The motion is granted with respect to the extension of time to respond to the complaint and to complete a Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) conference. The motion is denied, despite Plaintiffs lack of objection, with respect to the extension of time to hold a Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 conference, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) and L.R. 16.1. Defendants shall file their responsive pleadings on or before October 16, 2018. The parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order / discovery plan by October 8, 2018. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 scheduling teleconference shall be held on October 10, 2018 at 11:30 a.m. Parties will be provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail this date. Signed on 10/4/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 28, 2018 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint and Complete Rule 26(F) Conference filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Installation and Service Technologies, Inc., Skinny IT Corp. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lawrence, James)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 IT IS ORDERED Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Complete Rule 26(f) Conference (Doc. #7) is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before September 30, 2018. It is further ORDERED the parties shall meet to fulfill the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before September 30, 2018. It is further ORDERED this case is set for pretrial conference on Wednesday, October 10, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. It is further ORDERED the parties shall file a joint proposed scheduling order / discovery plan by October 5, 2018. It is further ORDERED the pretrial conference set on September 26, 2018 is CANCELED. It is further ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint (Doc. #6) is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed on 9/7/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 6, 2018 Filing 9 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before District Judge Brian C. Wimes: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/6/2018; order to issue. Time in court: 9:30 a.m. to 9:40 a.m. To order a transcript of this hearing please contact Denise Halasey, 816-512-5657. (Baldwin, Joella)
September 5, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF HEARING - This is the official notice for this hearing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. Telephone Conference set for 9/6/2018 at 9:30 a.m., before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Parties have been provided the conference call-in numbers via e-mail this date.(Baldwin, Joella)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Complaint and Complete Rule 26(f) Conference filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Installation and Service Technologies, Inc., Skinny IT Corp. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lawrence, James)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Installation and Service Technologies, Inc., Skinny IT Corp. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/4/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lawrence, James)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 9/14/2018., Rule 26 conference due by 8/31/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 9/26/2018 at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Signed on 8/16/18 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella)
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Jennifer L. Berhorst on behalf of Sam M. Darwish, Installation and Service Technologies, Inc., Skinny IT Corp (Berhorst, Jennifer)
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to file Under Seal Petition and Exhibits filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of Sam M. Darwish, Installation and Service Technologies, Inc., Skinny IT Corp. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 8/28/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Lawrence, James)
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri County, case number 1816-CV17214, filed by James Dale Lawrence on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5893432. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lawrence, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horwitz et al v. Skinny IT Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamkor, Inc.
Represented By: Leslie A. Greathouse
Represented By: Angus White Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Horwitz
Represented By: Leslie A. Greathouse
Represented By: Angus White Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Installation and Service Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: James Dale Lawrence
Represented By: Jennifer L. Berhorst
Represented By: Mollie Elizabeth Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam M. Darwish
Represented By: James Dale Lawrence
Represented By: Jennifer L. Berhorst
Represented By: Mollie Elizabeth Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skinny IT Corp
Represented By: James Dale Lawrence
Represented By: Jennifer L. Berhorst
Represented By: Mollie Elizabeth Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?