Arneson v. Midwest Contracting Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Julie D Arneson
Defendant: Midwest Contracting Services d/b/a R&B Trucking and Midwest Contracting Services, LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00647
Filed: August 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Office: Kansas City Office
County: Jackson
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Filing 27 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #7 MOTION to remand filed by Michael T. Miller on behalf of Julie D Arneson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Miller, Michael)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PROTECTIVE ORDER - ORDER granting #19 motion for protective order. Signed on 10/3/18 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Anderson, Christy)
September 28, 2018 Filing 25 REPLY SUGGESTIONS MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant Midwest Contracting Services, LLC. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Wood, Mitchell) Modified on 10/1/2018 to properly link to Motion #5 , document remains the same; regenerated NEF (Ellis, Lindsey).
September 28, 2018 Filing 24 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #7 MOTION to remand filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant Midwest Contracting Services, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Wood, Mitchell)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File its Reply Suggestions. Defendant shall file its Reply Suggestions in Support of its Motion to Dismiss on or before September 28, 2018. Signed on 9/28/2018 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Rosa, Patricia)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Defendant shall file its Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand on or before September 28, 2018. Signed on 9/28/2018 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Rosa, Patricia)
September 26, 2018 Filing 21 Second MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #9 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Midwest Contracting Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Wood, Mitchell)
September 26, 2018 Filing 20 Second MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #7 MOTION to remand filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Midwest Contracting Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Wood, Mitchell)
September 26, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Midwest Contracting Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Wood, Mitchell)
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant Midwest Contracting Services, LLC.(Wood, Mitchell)
September 24, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael T. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Julie D Arneson.(Miller, Michael)
September 24, 2018 Filing 16 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming John R. Phillips(Miller, Michael)
September 21, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #7 MOTION to remand filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Wood, Mitchell)
September 21, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #9 Suggestions in Opposition to Motion, filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Wood, Mitchell)
September 19, 2018 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant Midwest Contracting Services, LLC.(Wood, Mitchell)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 2/22/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 3/22/2019. Status Reports due by 1/11/2019. Please see text of order for other deadlines. Trial to be set by future order. Signed on 9/17/2018 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
September 14, 2018 Filing 11 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Julie D Arneson. (Miller, Michael)
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of appearance by Catherine Chesney Thompson on behalf of Midwest Contracting Services, LLC (Attorney Catherine Chesney Thompson added to party Midwest Contracting Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Thompson, Catherine)
September 7, 2018 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael T. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Julie D Arneson. Reply suggestions due by 9/21/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Miller, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in support re #7 MOTION to remand filed by Michael T. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Julie D Arneson. (Related document(s) #7 ) (Miller, Michael)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to remand filed by Michael T. Miller on behalf of Julie D Arneson. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/21/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Miller, Michael)
August 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Defendant Midwest Contracting Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Wood, Mitchell)
August 24, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of Midwest Contracting Services, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/7/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Wood, Mitchell)
August 22, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 8/20/2018 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by Mitchell E. Wood on behalf of All Defendants (Wood, Mitchell)
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Jackson County County, case number 1816-cv17195, Midwest Contracting Services d/b/a R&B Trucking. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5899408. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wood, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arneson v. Midwest Contracting Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie D Arneson
Represented By: Morgan L. Roach
Represented By: Michael T. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Contracting Services d/b/a R&B Trucking
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Contracting Services, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell E. Wood
Represented By: Catherine Chesney Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?