United States of America v. 2015 Ford F-150 Lobo, VIN: 1FTEW1EF3FKD18800
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2015 Ford F-150 Lobo, VIN: 1FTEW1EF3FKD18800
Case Number: 4:2018cv00689
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF SERVICE of Rule G forfeiture action executed as to 2015 Ford F-150 Lobo, VIN: 1FTEW1EF3FKD18800. 2015 Ford F-150 Lobo, VIN: 1FTEW1EF3FKD18800 served on 10/4/2018. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
September 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of appearance by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America (Attorney Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock added to party United States of America(pty:pla))(Perkins Rock, Stacey)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Bancomer by United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Antonio Bejar Baca by United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Notice of Coimplaint for Forfeiture to Grisel Bejar Baca by United States of America (Blackburn, Amy)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against 2015 Ford F-150 Lobo, VIN: 1FTEW1EF3FKD18800 filed by Amy B. Blackburn on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 11/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Blackburn, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2015 Ford F-150 Lobo, VIN: 1FTEW1EF3FKD18800
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2015 Ford F-150 Lobo, VIN: 1FTEW1EF3FKD18800
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Amy B. Blackburn
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?