Bowers v. Harvey et al
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Scott Harvey Real Estate Services, LLC. and Scott Harvey
Case Number: 4:2018cv00718
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Roseann Ketchmark
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order of Dismissal.The Court, having been notified of the settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Courts determination, hereby orders that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event, however, that the settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case, provided that the motion is filed within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order. In addition, the Court retains jurisdiction over enforcement of the settlement agreed to by the parties. Signed on 10/19/2018 by District Judge Roseann Ketchmark. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Stout, Courtney)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of settlement by Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
October 5, 2018 Filing 6 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Eric Bowers. Waiver sent to Scott Harvey Real Estate Services, LLC. on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Voytas, Richard)
October 5, 2018 Filing 5 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Eric Bowers. Waiver sent to Scott Harvey on 10/2/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. (Voytas, Richard)
October 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers (Voytas, Richard)
September 13, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scott Harvey, Scott Harvey Real Estate Services, LLC.. (Woods, Gloria)
September 13, 2018 Filing 3 ***Remark: AO-121 Report on the Filing of an action sent via regular mail to the Register of Copyrights Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (Woods, Gloria)
September 13, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Scott Harvey, Scott Harvey Real Estate Services, LLC. filed by Richard A. Voytas, Jr on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5935680. Service due by 12/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Voytas, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Harvey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Harvey Real Estate Services, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Richard A. Voytas, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?