Obermark v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Obermark
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections and John and Jane Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2018cv00731
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ortrie D Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 38:4301
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2018 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Clay County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Geiser, Angel)
September 18, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND (2) REMANDING CASE TO STATE COURT. Signed on 9/18/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to withdraw document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Eileen Ruppe Krispin on behalf of Missouri Department of Corrections. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/1/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Krispin, Eileen)
September 17, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 9/14/18 as Document No. 2, Civil Cover Sheet. The document has been deleted per Administrative Procedures wherein it is stated that a civil cover sheet is to be filed as an attachment to the complaint or notice of removal. The civil cover sheet has been added to Doc. #1, Notice of Removal. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Keller, Jeanne)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RULE 502(d) ORDER - Signed on 9/17/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RULE 16 NOTICE - Rule 26 conference due by 11/1/2018. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/15/2018. Signed on 9/17/18 by District Judge Ortrie D. Smith. (O'Connor, Stacy)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to quash Motion to Quash Purported Service of Summons on Defendants John and Jane Does 1-10 filed by Eileen Ruppe Krispin on behalf of Defendant Missouri Department of Corrections. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Krispin, Eileen)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to quash Motion to Quash Purported Service of Summons on Defendants John and Jane Does 1-10 filed by Eileen Ruppe Krispin on behalf of Missouri Department of Corrections. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 9/28/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Krispin, Eileen)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice to Parties of Notice of Removal by Missouri Department of Corrections re #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Krispin, Eileen)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Eileen Ruppe Krispin on behalf of Missouri Department of Corrections (Krispin, Eileen)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of filing Civil Cover Sheet by Missouri Department of Corrections re #1 Notice of Removal, (Krispin, Eileen) Modified on 9/19/2018 to reflect Civil Cover Sheet deleted and attached to the Notice of Removal, Doc. #1 (Jones, Robin).
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County County, case number 18CY-CV07905, filed by Eileen Ruppe Krispin on behalf of Missouri Department of Corrections. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5938860. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Krispin, Eileen) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/17/2018: #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Keller, Jeanne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obermark v. Missouri Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missouri Department of Corrections
Represented By: Eileen Ruppe Krispin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Obermark
Represented By: John H Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?