Ward et al v. Teamsters Local 955 et al
Plaintiff: Gary Ward and G.W. Distribution, LLC
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955 and John Does 1 - 5
Case Number: 4:2018cv00746
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Gary A Fenner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2018 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Cass County, Missouri. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Melvin, Greg)
October 25, 2018 Filing 14 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 motion to remand and request for attorneys' fees and costs. Signed on 10/25/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
October 18, 2018 Filing 12 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 17, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs G.W. Distribution, LLC, Gary Ward. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 11, 2018 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiffs G.W. Distribution, LLC, Gary Ward.(Kapke, George)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 10, 2018 Filing 8 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs G.W. Distribution, LLC, Gary Ward. Reply suggestions due by 10/24/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #4 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in support re #6 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiffs G.W. Distribution, LLC, Gary Ward. (Related document(s) #6 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of G.W. Distribution, LLC, Gary Ward. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/12/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUGGESTIONS in support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA)(Related document(s) #4 ) (Amash, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/10/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Amash, Michael)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 11/3/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/24/2018. Signed on 9/19/18 by District Judge Gary A. Fenner. (Mitchell, Lisa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Seventeenth Judicial Circuit County, case number 18CA-CC00276, filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5945718. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: CBA, #3 Exhibit C: State Court Docket)(Amash, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/19/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward et al v. Teamsters Local 955 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Ward
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Paul Douglas Anderson
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.W. Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Paul Douglas Anderson
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955
Represented By: Michael Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1 - 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?