Schutz v. Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Steven Schutz
Defendant: John 1,2,3, et cet. Doe, Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Teamsters Local 955, Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Master's Transportation Inc. and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 4:2018cv00793
Filed: October 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: Nanette K Laughrey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 Remand letter and instructions sent to Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri at Independence. This is a text entry only - no document is attached (Melvin, Greg)
November 16, 2018 Filing 37 CLERK'S JUDGMENT (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Plaintiff's motion to remand, Doc. #5 , is granted. However, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is denied. Defendants' motions to dismiss, Docs. #13 , #14 , and #16 , are denied for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The case is remanded to the Sixteenth Judicial Circuit Court of Jackson County, Missouri for all further proceedings. Signed on 11/16/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Levy, Lindsey)
November 14, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
November 9, 2018 Filing 35 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. (Related document(s) #14 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
November 9, 2018 Filing 34 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Bill Sanders(Kapke, George)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Sur-replies are not permitted to allow a party to present an argument that they had an opportunity to and should have presented previously. Defendants were on notice and had an opportunity to respond to Plaintiff's argument that removing parties "must identify the specific provision" of a collective bargaining agreement that actually sets forth the right upon which Plaintiff's claim is arguably based or that requires the Court's interpretation, as the issue was raised in Plaintiff's initial suggestions in support of the motion to remand. See Doc. #6 , pp. 6, 12 (citing Markham v. Wertin, 861 F.3d 748 (8th Cir. 2017). Thus, Defendants' motion for leave to file a sur-reply, Doc. #27 , is denied. Signed on 11/5/2018 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Levy, Lindsey)
November 2, 2018 Filing 32 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #27 Joint MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC, Teamsters Local 955. (Related document(s) #27 ) (Amash, Michael)
November 2, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of appearance by Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Sanocki, Kristen)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER entered by Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. Defendants' reply suggestions to the Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is due by 11/2/2018. Signed on 10/31/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 31, 2018 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955.(Amash, Michael)
October 30, 2018 Filing 28 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #27 Joint MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz. Reply suggestions due by 11/13/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #27 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 30, 2018 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/13/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Poplstein, Charles)
October 26, 2018 Filing 26 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz. Reply suggestions due by 11/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 25 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz. Reply suggestions due by 11/9/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/26/2018: Relationship of docket entry changed. Document incorrectly linked to Doc. 14 when filed. It is now linked to Doc. 16. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 25, 2018 Filing 23 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Reply suggestions due by 11/8/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
October 23, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by George E. Kapke, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz.(Kapke, George)
October 19, 2018 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Rita L. Hoop on behalf of Defendant Master's Transportation Inc..(Hoop, Rita)
October 19, 2018 Filing 20 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER by Steven Schutz. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2018: Main document replaced. Per Administrative Procedures, proposed scheduling orders should not contain a signature line for the presiding judge. The proposed scheduling order should include the electronic signature of both the filing and opposing counsel. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
October 17, 2018 Filing 19 REPLY SUGGESTIONS to motion re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 17, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
October 16, 2018 Filing 18 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. Reply suggestions due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Defendant Teamsters Local 955. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: CBA)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Amash, Michael)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Michael Amash on behalf of Teamsters Local 955. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/30/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Michael Amash added to party Teamsters Local 955(pty:dft))(Amash, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 15 SUGGESTIONS in support re #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #14 ) (Poplstein, Charles)
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Poplstein, Charles)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Rita L. Hoop on behalf of Master's Transportation Inc.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/29/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A)(Hoop, Rita)
October 15, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Rita L. Hoop on behalf of Defendant Master's Transportation Inc..(Hoop, Rita)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Rita L. Hoop on behalf of Master's Transportation Inc. (Attorney Rita L. Hoop added to party Master's Transportation Inc.(pty:dft))(Hoop, Rita)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Proposed scheduling order due by 10/19/2018. Rule 26 conference due by 10/17/2018. Signed on 10/12/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ON PRETRIAL PROCEDURES. Signed on 10/12/18 by District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey. (Matthes Mitra, Renea)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TRANSFERRING/REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to District Judge Nanette K. Laughrey for all further proceedings. Chief District Judge Greg Kays no longer assigned to case. Signed on 10/12/18 by Chief District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
October 11, 2018 Filing 7 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz. Reply suggestions due by 10/25/2018. (Schermerhorn, Andrew) Modified on 10/15/2018: Docket text changed to match filing event. Doc. 7 now linked to Doc. 13. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 SUGGESTIONS in support re #5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Plaintiff Steven Schutz. (Related document(s) #5 ) (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to remand filed by Andrew Schermerhorn on behalf of Steven Schutz. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 10/25/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Schermerhorn, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Brian Lamping on behalf of Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC (Attorney Brian Lamping added to party Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Lamping added to party Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC(pty:dft))(Lamping, Brian)
October 8, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Charles M. Poplstein on behalf of Defendants Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC.(Poplstein, Charles)
October 8, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc., Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-5974471. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal, Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal, Ex. B, #3 Notice of Exhibit Attachment Notice of Removal to Plaintiff, #4 Notice of Exhibit Attachment Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Poplstein, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schutz v. Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Schutz
Represented By: George E. Kapke, Jr.
Represented By: Paul Douglas Anderson
Represented By: John M. Klamann
Represented By: Andrew Schermerhorn
Represented By: Michael J. Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1,2,3, et cet. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Bakeries USA, Inc.
Represented By: Charles M. Poplstein
Represented By: Brian Lamping
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 955
Represented By: Michael Amash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, LLC
Represented By: Charles M. Poplstein
Represented By: Brian Lamping
Represented By: Kristen Elizabeth Sanocki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Master's Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Rita L. Hoop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?