Armour v. Bank of America N.A.
Plaintiff: Wilson Armour
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00818
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses on behalf of Bank of America N.A..(Shredl, Steven)
October 31, 2018 Filing 5 Before this Court is Defendant Bank of America, N.A.'s Consent Motion for an Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. (Doc. #4). For good cause stated the motion is granted. Defendant is granted an extension of time until and including December 7, 2018, to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed on 10/31/18 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
October 31, 2018 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading filed by Steven Shredl on behalf of Bank of America N.A.. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 11/14/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Shredl, Steven)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Steven Shredl on behalf of Bank of America N.A. (Attorney Steven Shredl added to party Bank of America N.A.(pty:dft))(Shredl, Steven)
October 16, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bank of America N.A.. (Woods, Gloria)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America N.A. filed by Keith N. Williston on behalf of Wilson Armour. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5987665. Service due by 1/14/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williston, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armour v. Bank of America N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Armour
Represented By: Keith N. Williston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Steven Shredl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?