United States of America v. 2019 Lexus NX300
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 2019 Lexus NX300
Case Number: 4:2018cv00886
Filed: November 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Referring Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Between the United States and Toyota by United States of America. (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
December 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of filing Notice of Claim to Property by 2019 Lexus NX300 (Liesen, Sarah)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIM filed by 2019 Lexus NX300. 2019 Lexus NX300 answer due 12/31/2018. on behalf of Defendant 2019 Lexus NX300. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sale Contract, #2 Exhibit Title Details)(Attorney David Jack added to party 2019 Lexus NX300(pty:dft))(Jack, David)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint to Toyota by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of filing Notice of Complaint for Forfeiture to Henry Asomani by United States of America (Perkins Rock, Stacey)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. With the consent of the Honorable Howard F. Sachs this case is reassigned to District Judge Howard F. Sachs for all further proceedings. District Judge Stephen R. Bough no longer assigned to case Signed on 11/8/18 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Diefenbach, Tracy)
November 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Forfeiture In Rem against 2019 Lexus NX300, VIN: JTJBARBZ5K2180053 filed by Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock on behalf of United States of America. Filing fee waived. Service due by 2/5/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perkins Rock, Stacey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 2019 Lexus NX300
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2019 Lexus NX300
Represented By: David Jack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Stacey Elaine Perkins Rock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?