Hornbeck et al v. Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Shawn Hornbeck, Monte Burgess, Dan Chevalier and Raymond Bieri
Defendant: Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC, CITGO Petroleum Corporation and Family Center of Harrisonville, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv00941
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your post-mediation status report is due within 10 calendar days after the mediation. See MAP FAQs on Court's website for specifics and submit report(s) to: map@mow.uscourts.gov. (ADI, MAP)
January 18, 2019 Filing 22 Joint MOTION for protective order filed by Abby L. Risner on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/1/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulated Protective Order)(Risner, Abby) Modified on 1/22/2019: The proposed order attached to the motion has been deleted. Per Administrative Procedures, any proposed orders are to be emailed to the Courtroom Deputy in Word format. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
January 18, 2019 ***Remark: Defendant Family Center of Harrisonville, Inc. added on 1/18/19 with the filing of the amended complaint (Doc. 19) on 1/17/19. (Melvin, Greg)
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL RULE 26 DISCLOSURES filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Plaintiffs Raymond Bieri, Monte Burgess, Dan Chevalier, Shawn Hornbeck.(Hubbard, Dirk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 20 DESIGNATION OF MEDIATOR naming Phil Miller(Hubbard, Dirk)
January 17, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Class Action Complaint against All Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs.(Hubbard, Dirk)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Class Certification Motion due 7/15/19. Discovery due by 3/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2020. Teleconference set for 9/4/2020 10:00 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 10:00 AM Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020, 8:30 AM in Courtroom 7A, Kansas City (BP) before Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. Signed on 1/16/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 motion for leave to file Amended Complaint an add additional parties. Plaintiff shall have three business days to electronically file the Amended Complaint. Signed on 1/15/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Wolfe, Steve)
January 14, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by All Plaintiffs filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of Plaintiffs Monte Burgess, Shawn Hornbeck.(Hubbard, Dirk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to file filed by Dirk L. Hubbard on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hubbard, Dirk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 14 Joint PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER Case Management Report and Joint Proposed Scheduling and Trial Order by Monte Burgess, Shawn Hornbeck. (Hubbard, Dirk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS Orscheln Farm and Home LLC d/b/a Orscheln Farm and Home filed by Abby L. Risner on behalf of Defendant Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC.(Risner, Abby)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Robert L. Duckels for CITGO Petroleum Corporation and Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
December 5, 2018 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
December 4, 2018 Filing 11 Motion to allow Robert L. Duckels to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6061111) filed by Robert L. Duckels on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Attorney Robert L. Duckels added to party CITGO Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Robert L. Duckels added to party Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC(pty:dft))(Duckels, Robert)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 1/17/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 1/3/2019. Signed on 12/3/18 by District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
November 30, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
November 29, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of filing Notice of Removal in State Court and Proof of Service by CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Mueller, Peter)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 & #6 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Abby L. Risner and John C Drake for defendants allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
November 28, 2018 Filing 6 Motion to allow John C. Drake to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6053668) filed by John C Drake on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Attorney John C Drake added to party CITGO Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John C Drake added to party Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC(pty:dft))(Drake, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Motion to allow Abby L. Risner to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6053616) filed by Abby L. Risner on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. (Attorney Abby L. Risner added to party CITGO Petroleum Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Abby L. Risner added to party Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC(pty:dft))(Risner, Abby)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Peter W Mueller on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC d/b/a Orscheln Farm and Home (Mueller, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT [Declaration] Benjamin A. Briseno by CITGO Petroleum Corporation. (Mueller, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Peter W Mueller on behalf of Defendant CITGO Petroleum Corporation.(Mueller, Peter)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cass County County, case number 18CA-CC00106, filed by Peter W Mueller on behalf of CITGO Petroleum Corporation, Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC d/b/a Orscheln Farm and Home. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6053242. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mueller, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hornbeck et al v. Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Hornbeck
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr.
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monte Burgess
Represented By: Gene P. Graham, Jr.
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Represented By: Bryan White
Represented By: Thomas V Bender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Chevalier
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Bieri
Represented By: Dirk L. Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC
Represented By: Abby L. Risner
Represented By: Devan Calleen Rittler
Represented By: John C Drake
Represented By: Todd W. Ruskamp
Represented By: Russell J. Shankland
Represented By: Peter W Mueller
Represented By: Robert L. Duckels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITGO Petroleum Corporation
Represented By: Abby L. Risner
Represented By: John C Drake
Represented By: Peter W Mueller
Represented By: Robert L. Duckels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Family Center of Harrisonville, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?