Kelly v. Millsap & Singer LLC et al
Plaintiff: Scott Edward Kelly
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC and Millsap & Singer LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00953
Filed: December 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3731
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 5 MAIL RETURNED as unclaimed. Mail sent to Scott Edward Kelly. (Related document(s) #3 ) (Kern, Kendra)
December 13, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Copy of judgment mailed with #3 Order. (Anderson, Christy)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; denying motion for temporary restraining order and permanent injunction. Plainitff's complaint is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed on 12/13/18 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. Copy of order mailed via first class and certified mail (Rct No. 7012 3460 0001 7395 7357) to Scott Edward Kelly at 419 N.W. 81st Street, Kansas City, MO 64118. (Anderson, Christy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 2 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Scott Edward Kelly. (Woods, Gloria) Modified on 12/4/2018 to reflect correct filing date.(Woods, Gloria).
December 3, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Scott Edward Kelly. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 12/18/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Complaint (Temporary Restraining Order-Permanenent Injunction & 1.5 Million Dollar Counterclaim for Breach of Contract in the Mortgage Loan) #2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Exhibit--Deleted as document is a proposed order)(Woods, Gloria)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelly v. Millsap & Singer LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Millsap & Singer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Edward Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?