Bowers v. Northland Partners, L.L.C. et al

Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Defendant: Dani Beyer, Northland Partners, L.L.C. and Lucas Sherraden
Case Number: 4:2018cv00990
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Referring Judge: Howard F Sachs
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of Dani Beyer.(Attorney Frederick H. Riesmeyer, II added to party Dani Beyer(pty:dft))(Riesmeyer, Frederick)
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Katherine Alexandra Bechina on behalf of Defendant Northland Partners, L.L.C..(Bechina, Katherine)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Northland Partners, L.L.C. served on 2/3/2019, answer due 3/25/2019. (Ross, Nathan) Modified on 2/14/2019 to correct service date (Crocker, Susan).
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Eric Bowers. (Ross, Nathan)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion for extension of time to answer. Lucas Sherraden and Northland Partners, L.L.C., must answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint no later than March 25, 2019. Signed on February 6, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
January 30, 2019 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Katherine Alexandra Bechina on behalf of Lucas Sherraden. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/13/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Bechina, Katherine)
January 30, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of appearance by Katherine Alexandra Bechina on behalf of Northland Partners, L.L.C., Lucas Sherraden (Attorney Katherine Alexandra Bechina added to party Northland Partners, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Katherine Alexandra Bechina added to party Lucas Sherraden(pty:dft))(Bechina, Katherine)
January 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by David Robert Barnard on behalf of Northland Partners, L.L.C., Lucas Sherraden (Attorney David Robert Barnard added to party Northland Partners, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney David Robert Barnard added to party Lucas Sherraden(pty:dft))(Barnard, David)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of appearance by Ethan William Gee on behalf of Eric Bowers (Attorney Ethan William Gee added to party Eric Bowers(pty:pla))(Gee, Ethan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Dani Beyer served on 12/26/2018, answer due 2/15/2019. (Ross, Nathan)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Eric Bowers. Lucas Sherraden served on 1/9/2019, answer due 1/30/2019. (Gee, Ethan)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Dani Beyer must respond to Plaintiff's complaint no later than February 15, 2019. Signed on January 14, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) to file Answer or Otherwise Plead filed by Margaret K Young on behalf of Dani Beyer. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 1/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Young, Margaret)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of appearance by Margaret K Young on behalf of Dani Beyer (Attorney Margaret K Young added to party Dani Beyer(pty:dft))(Young, Margaret)
December 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Per ORDER OF RECUSAL at Doc. #4 , this case is reassigned to District Judge Greg Kays for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 4:18-00990-CV-W-DGK. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Moore, Terri)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL In the interest of appearances, I shall recuse, and direct that the clerk's office reassign this case to another judge. Signed on 12/20/2018 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Travis, Kendra)
December 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
December 18, 2018 Filing 3 ***Remark - Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to Register of Copyrights. (Woods, Gloria)
December 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Nathan Ross on behalf of Eric Bowers. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6084146. Service due by 3/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit VA 1-967-368, #2 Exhibit VA 2-026-446, #3 Exhibit VA 1-967-366, #4 Exhibit VA 1-980-468, #5 Exhibit VA 1-965-604, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ross, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowers v. Northland Partners, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dani Beyer
Represented By: Margaret K Young
Represented By: Frederick H. Riesmeyer, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northland Partners, L.L.C.
Represented By: Katherine Alexandra Bechina
Represented By: David Robert Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucas Sherraden
Represented By: Katherine Alexandra Bechina
Represented By: David Robert Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Bowers
Represented By: Nathan Ross
Represented By: Ethan William Gee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?