Momtahan v. Curators of the University of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Afsaneh Momtahan
Defendant: Curators of the University of Missouri, Dr. Pamela Overman, Richard Bigham, The University of Missouri at Kansas City School of Dentistry, Marsha Pyle and The University of Missouri at Kansas City
Case Number: 4:2018cv01018
Filed: December 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Lajuana M Counts
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 29:754
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. The court has denied your pro hac vice motion because the attorney seeking admission did not submit an original signature on the affidavit, as required. To better meet the requirements of recently amended Local Rule 83.5(h), the pro hac vice form was revised. This new form is now required and is available on our court website at #Pro Hac Vice Form. If you still wish to proceed pro hac vice in this case, please refile your motion providing an original signature. To avoid being charged a duplicate fee, please insert the receipt number issued for this motion in the receipt box on your new filing. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
February 13, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF WAIVER OF SERVICE filed by Afsaneh Momtahan. Waiver sent to Richard Bigham on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Curators of the University of Missouri on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Pamela Overman on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019; Marsha Pyle on 2/4/2019, answer due 4/5/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver--Curators, #2 Exhibit Waiver--Overman, #3 Exhibit Waiver--Pyle, #4 Exhibit Waiver--Bigham)(Johnson, Jarrett)
February 4, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
February 4, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to allow P. Adam Davis to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6157420) filed by Jarrett A Johnson on behalf of Afsaneh Momtahan. (Johnson, Jarrett)
January 25, 2019 SECOND NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 2/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Melvin, Greg)
December 28, 2018 NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT e-mailed to Plaintiff's attorney. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 1/18/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria)
December 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
December 28, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Jarrett A Johnson on behalf of AFSANEH MOMTAHAN. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6097438. Service due by 3/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1--Cohen Letter, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2--Policies and Procedures, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3--Commn on Dental Accreditation)(Johnson, Jarrett) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/4/2019: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Momtahan v. Curators of the University of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Afsaneh Momtahan
Represented By: Jarrett A Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curators of the University of Missouri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pamela Overman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Bigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Missouri at Kansas City School of Dentistry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsha Pyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Missouri at Kansas City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?