Substation K, Inc. v. Kansas City Power & Light Company
Plaintiff: Substation K, Inc.
Defendant: Kansas City Power & Light Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00031
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Bough
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. (Ballew, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Mark D. Anstoetter on behalf of Defendant Kansas City Power & Light Company.(Anstoetter, Mark)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER :Before this Court is Defendant Kansas City Power & Light Company's Motion for Extension of Time. (Doc. #6). For good cause stated the Motion is granted. Defendant is granted an extension of time until and including April 5, 2019, to file its responsive pleading. Signed on 2/14/19 by District Judge Stephen R. Bough. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 13, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for extension of time filed by Mark D. Anstoetter on behalf of Kansas City Power & Light Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/27/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Mark D. Anstoetter added to party Kansas City Power & Light Company(pty:dft))(Anstoetter, Mark)
February 7, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 2/6/19 as Document No. 5, RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed. The document has been deleted as the service information was not completed. Counsel will refile the document using the event and complete service information to set the answer deadline for defendant. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Ellis, Lindsey)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by All Plaintiffs. All Parties. (Bowers, Aaron)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Aaron L Bowers for Substation K, Inc. allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
January 16, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kansas City Power & Light Company. (Woods, Gloria)
January 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Motion to allow Aaron L. Bowers to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6126658) filed by David Lewis Ballew on behalf of Substation K, Inc.. (Ballew, David)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kansas City Power & Light Company filed by David Lewis Ballew on behalf of Substation K, Inc.. Filing fee $400, receipt number BMOWDC-6126645. Service due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Ballew, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Woods, Gloria).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Substation K, Inc. v. Kansas City Power & Light Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Substation K, Inc.
Represented By: David Lewis Ballew
Represented By: Aaron Lowell Bowers
Represented By: John M. Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City Power & Light Company
Represented By: David Brenton Dwerlkotte
Represented By: Kathryn A. Larkins
Represented By: Mark D. Anstoetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?