Taylor v. KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar
Plaintiff: McKenzi Taylor
Defendant: KC VIN, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc. and Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00110
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #31 & #32 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorneys Eve-Lynn J Rapp and Rafey S. Balabanian for McKenzi Taylor allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
April 4, 2019 Filing 32 Motion to allow Rafey Balabanian to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6256833) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of McKenzi Taylor. (Kenney, William)
April 4, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to allow Eve-Lynn Rapp to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6256831) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of McKenzi Taylor. (Kenney, William)
April 2, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of filing Plaintiff's Notice of Subpoenas to Non-Parties by McKenzi Taylor (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena to SendSmart Software, Inc., #2 Exhibit Subpoena to IT Nachos, LLC, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Think Big Partners, LLC)(Ovca, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 motion to withdraw as attorney. Attorney Aristotle N. Rodopoulos is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff. Plaintiff will continue to be represented by Benjamin Richman, Michael Ovca, and William Kenney. Signed on 4/2/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to withdraw as attorney filed by Aristotle N. Rodopoulos on behalf of McKenzi Taylor. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/16/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Rodopoulos, Aristotle)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to All Defendants. Defendants' answers or responsive pleadings are now due April 29, 2019. Signed on 4/1/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by McKenzi Taylor Plaintiff's Initial Discovery Requests filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of Plaintiff McKenzi Taylor.(Kenney, William)
April 1, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for extension of time to file answer Defendants' Consent Motion to Set Date for All Defendants to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of All Defendants. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/15/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Jacqueline M Sexton added to party Entertainment Consulting International, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jacqueline M Sexton added to party The Cordish Companies, Inc.(pty:dft))(Sexton, Jacqueline) Modified on 4/1/2019: Main Document 25 replaced at request of filing counsel. NEF regenerated. (Melvin, Greg)
March 25, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Entertainment Consulting International, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against KC VIN, LLC, The Cordish Companies, Inc., Entertainment Consulting International, LLC filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of McKenzi Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet)(Kenney, William)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Benjamin H Richman for McKenzi Taylor allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 Motion to allow Benjamin Richman to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6215173) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of McKenzi Taylor. (Kenney, William)
March 11, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 3/8/2019 as Document No. 16, 17 and 18, Motion to Dismiss(16), Suggestion in Support(17) and the Notice of Filing(18). The documents have been deleted as they were filed in the incorrect case. Counsel refiled the corrected pleadings in entries 19,20 and 21. NEF will regenerate to all parties. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Kern, Kendra)
March 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of filing Notice of Constitutional Challenge by KC VIN, LLC (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 20 SUGGESTIONS in support re #19 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant KC VIN, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of Defendant KC VIN, LLC. (Related document(s) #19 ) (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant KC VIN, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing Notice of Constitutional Challenge by KC VIN, LLC (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 17 SUGGESTIONS in support re 16 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant KC VIn, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of Defendant KC VIN, LLC. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Sexton, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to dismiss case Defendant KC VIn, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Jacqueline) Modified on 3/11/2019 at the request of counsel. Please see docket modification. (Kern, Kendra)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Michael Ovca for McKenzi Taylor allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Geiser, Angel)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to allow Michael Ovca to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6206634) filed by William Charles Kenney on behalf of McKenzi Taylor. (Kenney, William)
March 6, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 #10 #11 motion to appear pro hac vice entered by Clerk of Court. Attorney Glenn T Graham, Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti, and Whitney Smith for KC VIN, LLC allowed to appear pro hac vice. This entry will serve as authorization for the pro hac participation by the attorney. Western District of Missouri Local Rule 5.1 requires documents to be filed electronically. If pro hac vice counsel has not already done so, counsel is directed to immediately register for a WDMO e-filing account for NextGen CM/ECF. This will enable counsel to electronically file documents and receive electronic notification of filings. Register for a WDMO e-filing account at #PACER. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Russel, Jeri)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 NOTICE. Rule 26 conference due by 4/1/2019. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/15/2019. Signed on 3/1/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. (Strodtman, Tracy)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to allow Glenn T. Graham to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196420) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to allow Whitney M. Smith to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196411) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to allow Lauri A. Mazzuchetti to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $100 receipt number AMOWDC-6196385) filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 motion for extension of time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before March 8, 2019. Signed on 2/14/19 by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law clerk)
February 14, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for extension of time Defendant KC Vin LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to File Its Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Petition filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 2/28/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Ellis, Lindsey)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of Defendant KC VIN, LLC.(Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of appearance by Zachary Tyler Bowles, I on behalf of KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar (Attorney Zachary Tyler Bowles, I added to party KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar(pty:dft))(Bowles, Zachary)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of appearance by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar (Sexton, Jacqueline)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of appearance by W. James Foland on behalf of KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar (Attorney W. James Foland added to party KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar(pty:dft))(Foland, W.)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 16th Circuit Court of Jackson County, MO County, case number 1816-CV19883, filed by Jacqueline M Sexton on behalf of KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6175846. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sexton, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. KC VIN, LLC d/b/a Pizza Bar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC VIN, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Represented By: W. James Foland
Represented By: Zachary Tyler Bowles, I
Represented By: Glenn T Graham
Represented By: Whitney M Smith
Represented By: Lauri Anne Mazzuchetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cordish Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entertainment Consulting International, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline M Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKenzi Taylor
Represented By: William Charles Kenney
Represented By: Aristotle N. Rodopoulos
Represented By: Rafey S. Balabanian
Represented By: Benjamin H Richman
Represented By: Michael Ovca
Represented By: Eve-Lynn J Rapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?