Palmer v. Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Piper L. Palmer
Defendant: Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, L.L.C., Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, Inc., Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, LLC and Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00117
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Fernando J Gaitan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - On 4/4/19, it was reported by the MAP Office that this case has been resolved through mediation. The parties are directed to file either a stipulation of dismissal or a status report discussing settlement progress on or before 5/6/2019. Signed on 4/4/19 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Anderson, Christy)
March 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of appearance by Christopher J. Seibold on behalf of Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC (Attorney Christopher J. Seibold added to party Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC(pty:dft))(Seibold, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Filing 11 SUGGESTIONS in opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jeffrey M Hensley on behalf of Plaintiff Piper L. Palmer. Reply suggestions due by 3/21/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Hensley, Jeffrey)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 SUGGESTIONS in support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christine A. Vaporean on behalf of Defendant Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC. (Related document(s) #9 ) (Vaporean, Christine)
February 21, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Christine A. Vaporean on behalf of Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/7/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Vaporean, Christine)
February 21, 2019 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Christine A. Vaporean on behalf of Defendant Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC.(Vaporean, Christine)
February 21, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent to Removal by Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Vaporean, Christine)
February 20, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RULE 16 NOTICE. Please see text of order. Signed on 2/19/2019 by District Judge Fernando J. Gaitan, Jr. (Shawver, Marylynn)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint on behalf of Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, Inc., Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, LLC.(Boatright, Daniel)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: # 1 MAP General Order)(Kern, Kendra) Modified on 2/19/2019 to remove duplicate filing. (Kern, Kendra)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Daniel B. Boatright on behalf of Defendants Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, Inc., Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, LLC.(Boatright, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Clay County Missouri County, case number 19CY-CV00273, Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, LLC, Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMOWDC-6177311. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Boatright, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palmer v. Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piper L. Palmer
Represented By: Jeffrey M Hensley
Represented By: Theodore C Beckett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Represented By: Jennifer Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesis ElderCare Rehabilitation Services, LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Boatright
Represented By: Jennifer Schorgl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashton Court Care and Rehabilitation Centre, LLC
Represented By: Christine A. Vaporean
Represented By: Christopher J. Seibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?