Bumpas v. Americans for Prosperity
Plaintiff: Paul Bumpas
Defendant: Americans for Prosperity
Case Number: 4:2019cv00122
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Beth Phillips
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. The parties have notified the court that this case has reached a settlement. All deadlines are suspended pending dismissal of this case. The parties are ordered to file either dismissal paperwork or a joint status report by May 10, 2019. Signed on 4/16/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE INTERESTS filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Defendant Americans for Prosperity.(Fries, Brian)
March 13, 2019 NOTICE of filing: Mediation and Assessment Program Reminder: Your Designation of Mediator is due soon (filed as an ADR event in CM/ECF). See Notice of Inclusion and MAP General Order for specifics. (ADI, MAP)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 4/22/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 4/8/2019. Signed on 3/8/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. (Cordell, Annette)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 : Defendant's Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is GRANTED, Defendant has up to and including April 12, 2019 to file an answer or response to Plaintiff's Complaint.Signed on 3/6/19 by Chief District Judge Beth Phillips. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Cordell, Annette)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for extension of time to file answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Brian C Fries on behalf of Americans for Prosperity. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Brian C Fries added to party Americans for Prosperity(pty:dft))(Fries, Brian)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Paul Bumpas. Americans for Prosperity served on 2/21/2019, answer due 3/14/2019. (Rodopoulos, Aristotle)
February 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Americans for Prosperity. (Woods, Gloria)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Americans for Prosperity filed by Aristotle N. Rodopoulos on behalf of Paul Bumpas. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6180919. Service due by 5/20/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rodopoulos, Aristotle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bumpas v. Americans for Prosperity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Americans for Prosperity
Represented By: Brian C Fries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bumpas
Represented By: Aristotle N. Rodopoulos
Represented By: Noah K. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?