Verschelden v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Catherine Verschelden
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability, Basic Term Life Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of Stinson Leonard Street LLP and The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00167
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Greg Kays
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Mack, Cristin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, on behalf of The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Mack, Cristin)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of dismissal to Dismiss Defendant Group Long Term Disability, Basic Term Life Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of Stinson Leonard Street ONLY by Group Long Term Disability, Basic Term Life Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of Stinson Leonard Street LLP, The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Mack, Cristin)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 unopposed motion for extension of time. The defendants must file their responsive pleadings no later than April 16, 2019. Signed on March 15, 2019, by District Judge Greg Kays. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Law Clerk)
March 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by Cristin J Mack on behalf of Group Long Term Disability, Basic Term Life Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of Stinson Leonard Street LLP, The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 3/29/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Related document(s) #1 ) (Attorney Cristin J Mack added to party Group Long Term Disability, Basic Term Life Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of Stinson Leonard Street LLP(pty:dft), Attorney Cristin J Mack added to party The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company(pty:dft))(Mack, Cristin)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Catherine Verschelden. Group Long Term Disability, Basic Term Life Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of Stinson Leonard Street LLP served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (Ravis, Talia)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Catherine Verschelden. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 3/6/2019, answer due 3/27/2019. (Ravis, Talia)
March 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. (Woods, Gloria)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS.Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Woods, Gloria)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Talia Ravis on behalf of Catherine Verschelden. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6204810. Service due by 6/3/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ravis, Talia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verschelden v. The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Group Long Term Disability, Basic Term Life Supplemental Dependent Life, Supplemental Term Life, Supplemental Accidental Death and Dismemberment Plan for Employees of Stinson Leonard Street LLP
Represented By: Cristin J Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Cristin J Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine Verschelden
Represented By: Talia Ravis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?